|
09.10.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
02.10.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.02.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
12.08.2015 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2015 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
21 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
45 |