Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015132588 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56032906 | 15.11.2006 | US201213472321 | 15.05.2012 | US201514600626 | 20.01.2015 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8993110 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2015 | B2 | US2012225288 | 06.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56032906 | 15.11.2006 | US201213472321 | 15.05.2012 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8202578 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2012 | B2 | US2007110981 | 17.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56032906 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006315105C | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | C1 | AU2006315105B | 16.02.2012 | B2 | AU2006315105 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60943 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1948574 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2010 | B1 | EP1948574 | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60943 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE454369T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60943 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0618604 | 21.03.2017 | B1 | BRPI0618604 | 06.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60943 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2627509 | 22.10.2013 | C | CA2627509 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60943 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101304962B | 26.09.2012 | B | CN101304962 | 12.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60943 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006011641D1 | 25.02.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US60943 | 15.11.2006 | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007059516 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73744205 | 15.11.2005 |