EP1948574 - CRUSH RESISTANT LATEX TOPCOAT COMPOSITION FOR FIBER CEMENT SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US | [2010/40] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 1101 South Third Street Minneapolis, MN 55415 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILLILEA, T., Howard 70 DEER HILLS COURT North Oaks, MN 55127 / US | 02 /
CAVALLIN, Carl, Lewis 10679 KARSTON AVENUE Albertville, MN 55301 / US | 03 /
CARTER, Shane, Wesley 8716 Northbrook Circle N. Brooklyn Park, MN 55428 / US | 04 /
MITTELSTEADT, John, William 17525 ICELAND COURT Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | 05 /
VETTER, Glen, Otto 8101 46 1/2 AVENUE NORTH New Hope, MN 55428 / US | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
KILLILEA, T., Howard 70 DEER HILLS COURT North Oaks, MN 55127 / US | ||
02 /
CAVALLIN, Carl, Lewis 10679 KARSTON AVENUE Albertville, MN 55301 / US | |||
03 /
CARTER, Shane, Wesley 8001 67TH AVENUE N. Brooklyn Park, MN 55428 / US | |||
04 /
MITTELSTEADT, John, William 17525 ICELAND COURT Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | |||
05 /
VETTER, Glen, Otto 8101 46 1/2 AVENUE NORTH New Hope, MN 55428 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06839902.1 | 15.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US60943 | Priority number, date | US20050737442P | 15.11.2005 Original published format: US 737442 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007059516 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948574 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948574 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/63, C04B41/70, E04C2/04 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
E04F13/147 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/483 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/63 (EP,US);
C04B41/70 (EP,US);
C09D133/12 (US);
C09D5/02 (EP,US);
E04C2/06 (EP,US);
E04D1/22 (US);
Y10T428/249932 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B20/0048, C04B28/02 (US,EP);
C04B41/483, C04B41/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRUCHFESTE LATEXDECKBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR FASERZEMENTSUBSTRATE | [2009/49] | English: | CRUSH RESISTANT LATEX TOPCOAT COMPOSITION FOR FIBER CEMENT SUBSTRATES | [2008/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COUCHE DE FINITION EN LATEX RESISTANT A L'ECRASEMENT POUR SUBSTRAT DE FIBROCIMENT | [2008/31] |
Former [2008/31] | DRUCKFESTE LATEXDECKBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR FASERZEMENTSUBSTRATE | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2010
13.10.2010
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2015/18] |
Former [2010/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2010
BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 11.11.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2013 | 24.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.11.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.11.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.04.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/46] | Appeal following opposition | 15.01.2015 | Appeal received No. T0291/15 | 20.03.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.04.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 25.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.01.2010 | BE | 06.01.2010 | CY | 06.01.2010 | CZ | 06.01.2010 | DK | 06.01.2010 | EE | 06.01.2010 | FI | 06.01.2010 | IT | 06.01.2010 | LT | 06.01.2010 | LV | 06.01.2010 | NL | 06.01.2010 | PL | 06.01.2010 | RO | 06.01.2010 | SE | 06.01.2010 | SI | 06.01.2010 | SK | 06.01.2010 | TR | 06.01.2010 | BG | 06.04.2010 | GR | 07.04.2010 | ES | 17.04.2010 | IS | 06.05.2010 | PT | 06.05.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | LU | 15.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
BE | 06.01.2010 | ||
CY | 06.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
BE | 06.01.2010 | ||
CY | 06.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
BE | 06.01.2010 | ||
CY | 06.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | SI | 06.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0894780 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-42 * claims 1,10 ** paragraphs [0073] , [0075] , [0076] , [0078] , [0079] , [0087] * |