EP2103155 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA CAPTURE FOR PUSH OVER CELLULAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Motorola, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Zhuo-Ming 3-402, 5 GuangZhou Road GuLou Qu Nanjing Jiangsu 210008 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Xiao-Feng 218 West Hanzhong Gate, A.V. Apt 04B601 Nanjing Jiangsu 210036 / CN | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06840604.0 | 22.12.2006 | [2009/39] | WO2006CN03540 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008077269 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103155 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/28 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04M1/656 (EP,US);
H04W4/10 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L65/4061 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR DATENERFASSUNG FÜR PUSH OVER CELLULAR | [2009/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA CAPTURE FOR PUSH OVER CELLULAR | [2009/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE DE DONNÉES POUR MESSAGERIE INSTANTANÉE VOCALE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 23.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 27.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0949621 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * figures 3,5 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] - [0026] , [0027] , [0032] , [0036] , [0037] *; | [A]US2003081737 (DEGEORGE MARTIN [US]) [A] 6,13,20* paragraphs [0004] - [0009] - [0023] - [0029] *; | [I]US2004132432 (MOORES TOBY [GB], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0011] , [0017] - [0027] - [0032] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] , [0066] , [0068] * * paragraphs [0073] , [0078] , [0091] , [0094] *; | [I]DE102004020533 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-20 * figures 2A,2B,3J.3K,3L * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0016] , [0018] , [0019] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0061] - [0068] * * paragraph [0071] *; | [I]EP1613104 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] , [0049]; figure 8 * * paragraphs [0059] - [0064] *; | [A]US2006056599 (CRAGUN BRIAN J [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0009] , [0034] , [0038] - [0040] - [0043] - [0045] * * figures 2,6 * | International search | [A]WO2005101697 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20060105900 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]CN1859648 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1859640 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | Examination | US2004184585 |