EP1881669 - IMPLEMENTING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING LAN SIGNALS IN OTN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Shimin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/43] |
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
ZOU, Shimin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06840628.9 | 25.12.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006CN03577 | Priority number, date | CN200510137825 | 31.12.2005 Original published format: CN200510137825 | [2008/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007076689 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881669 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881669 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/0241 (EP,US);
H04J3/1658 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON LAN-SIGNALEN IN OPTISCHEN TRANSPORTNETZEN | [2008/04] | English: | IMPLEMENTING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING LAN SIGNALS IN OTN | [2008/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX LAN DANS UN RESEAU DE TRANSPORT OPTIQUE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2007 | Translation filed | 11.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 09.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.12.2006 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | IE | 25.12.2013 | LU | 25.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 25.12.2006 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 25.12.2006 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1414173 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 45 - page 7, paragraph 51 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2005099282 (UTSTARCOM TELECOM CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | EP1742494 [ ] (UTSTARCOM TELECOM CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 9 * * page 6, paragraph 15 - page 7, paragraph 19 * * page 8, paragraph 27 - paragraph 30 * * page 10, paragraph 40 - page 11, paragraph 42 * * figures 4A,B * | [X] - CHENG YONGGANG HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO ET AL, "Justification for the support of data service mapping in OTN using lower order ODU0; D 294", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20050516), vol. STUDY GROUP 15, pages 1 - 5, XP017407410 [X] 1-3,7,8,13 * the whole document * | [X] - MAARTEN VISSERS ALCATEL SEL GERMANY ET AL, "Definition of a new transport entity ODU0; D 92", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20041129), vol. STUDY GROUP 15, pages 1 - 3, XP017407209 [X] 1,7,8,13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004205230 (FONTANA MICHELE [IT], et al); | [A]US2003161344 (MAGGI DONATO [IT], et al); | [A]WO2005036828 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | by applicant | EP1414173 | - MAARTEN VISSERS ALCATEL SEL GERMANT ET AL., "Definition of a new transport entity ODUO; D 92", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAI TELECOMMUNICM'ION UNION, (20041129), vol. 15, pages 1 - 3 | - CHEN YONGGANG HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO ET AL., "Justification for the support of data service mapping in OTN using lower order ODUO; D 294", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAI TELECOMMUNICM-ION UNION, (20050516), vol. 15, pages 1 - 5 |