|
21.03.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2021 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2021 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2021 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.04.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
25.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
18.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
02.01.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
26 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |