EP1951155 - ARTIFICIAL VALVE FOR IMPLANTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedicalTree Patents Ltd. Sir Temi Zammit Buildings Malta Life Sciences Park SGN3000, San Gwann / MT | [2021/01] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Thoraxica AG Zugerstrasse 74 6341 Baar / CH | ||
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Prosthesica AG Zugerstrasse 74 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Aegeristrasse 66 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2021/19] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstraße 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06840922.6 | 27.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006EP10379 | Priority number, date | US20050732477P | 02.11.2005 Original published format: US 732477 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007051568 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1951155 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951155 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
A61F2/2421 (EP,US);
A61F2/2475 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHES VENTIL ZUR IMPLANTATION | [2008/32] | English: | ARTIFICIAL VALVE FOR IMPLANTATION | [2008/32] | French: | VALVE ARTIFICIELLE DESTINEE A ETRE IMPLANTEE | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 18.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12188184.1 / EP2545885 | EP21200132.5 / EP3967273 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2006 | AT | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | LU | 27.10.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB1194358 (MEARS DANA CHRISTOPHER [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,14-24 * page 1, line 15 - line 38 * * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 9 * * page 2, line 10 - line 16 * * page 2, line 69 - line 70 * * page 2, line 72 - line 76 * * page 3, line 31 - line 55 * * page 3, line 68 - line 73 * * page 3, line 104 - line 105 * * page 3, line 115 - page 4, line 5 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6,9,11,12,25,32,94; | [A]WO8401282 (COHEN FRED MICHAEL) [A] 1,44,66,94 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1514526 (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figures 1-3 * |