EP2109976 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENFORCING SECURITY POLICIES IN MANETs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 1 20123 Milano / IT | [2015/24] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Piazza degli Affari 2 20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTA, Luciana Telecom Italia S.p.A Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | 02 /
FREGUGLIA, Giorgio Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | 03 /
FROSALI, Federico Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
COSTA, Luciana Telecom Italia S.p.A Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | ||
02 /
FREGUGLIA, Giorgio Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | |||
03 /
FROSALI, Federico Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | Representative(s) | Battipede, Francesco, et al Telecom Italia S.p.A. Patents Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Torino / IT | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/43] | Battipede, Francesco, et al Telecom Italia S.p.A. BPR - IPR Piazza L. Einaudi, 8 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06841210.5 | 29.12.2006 | [2009/43] | WO2006EP12606 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080430 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2109976 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2109976 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/08, H04L29/06, H04W12/12 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04W12/088 (EP,US);
H04W12/122 (EP,US);
H04W40/24 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM DURCHSETZEN VON SICHERHEITSRICHTLINIEN IN MANETS | [2009/43] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENFORCING SECURITY POLICIES IN MANETs | [2009/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MISE EN APPLICATION DE POLITIQUES DE SÉCURITÉ DANS DES RÉSEAUX MOBILES AD HOC | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2006 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IE | 29.12.2018 | LU | 29.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.12.2006 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 12.09.2018 | |
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA] - DJORDJEVIC I ET AL, "An architecture for dynamic security perimeters of virtual collaborative networks", NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, 2004. NOMS 2004. IEEE/IFIP SEOUL, KOREA APRIL 19-23, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040419), ISBN 0-7803-8230-7, pages 249 - 262, XP010712587 [X] 1-9,13-23,27,28 * the whole document * [A] 10-12,24-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.2004.1317663 | [XA] - RAMANUJAN R ET AL, "Intrusion-resistant ad hoc wireless networks", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. MILCOM 2002. PROCEEDINGS. ANAHEIM, CA, OCT. 7 - 10, 2002, IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021007), VOL. 1 OF 2, ISBN 0-7803-7625-0, pages 890 - 894, XP010631893 [X] 1-9,13-23,27,28 * the whole document * [A] 10-12,24-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2002.1179592 | [XA] - DJORDJEVIC I ET AL, "Architecture for secure work of dynamic distributed groups", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2004. CCNC 2004. FIRST IEEE LAS VEGAS, NV, USA 5-8 JAN. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040105), ISBN 0-7803-8145-9, pages 495 - 500, XP010696877 [X] 1-9,13-23,27,28 * the whole document * [A] 10-12,24-26 | [A] - P.G. ARGYROUDIS,D.O'MAHONY, "Secure Routing for Mobile Ad hoc Networks", (20060823), URL: http://www.ctvr.ie/docs/EN_Pubs/secure-adhoc-routing.pdf, (20070817), XP002447263 [A] 1-28 * Sections 3, 4 and 5 * | [DA] - CLAUSEN T ET AL, "Optimized Link State Routing Protocol (OLSR)", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200310), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009408 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document * | by applicant | - DJORDJEVIC I ET AL., "An architecture for dynamic security perimeters of virtual collaborative networks", NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, 2004, NOMS 2004, IEEE/IFIP SEOUL, (20040419), doi:doi:10.1109/NOMS.2004.1317663, pages 249 - 262, XP010712587 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.2004.1317663 | - RAMANUJAN R ET AL., "Intrusion-resistant ad hoc wireless networks", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, MILCOM 2002, PROCEEDINGS, ANAHEIM, CA, OCT. 7-10, 2002, IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, (20021007), vol. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1109/MILCOM.2002.1179592, pages 890 - 894, XP010631893 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2002.1179592 | - DJORDJEVIC I ET AL., "Architecture for secure work of dynamic distributed groups", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2004, CCNC 2004, FIRST IEEE LAS VEGAS, (20040105), doi:doi:10.1109/CCNC.2004.1286911, pages 495 - 500, XP032165260 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCNC.2004.1286911 |