EP1996802 - VAPOLIZATION DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE EXHAUST SYSTEM, EXHAUST SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VAPOLIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMCON Technologies Germany (Augsburg) GmbH Biberbachstrasse 9 86154 Augsburg / DE | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEMENT, Jürgen An der Königsmühle 10 86663 Asbach-Bäumenheim / DE | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/49] | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06841213.9 | 29.12.2006 | [2008/49] | WO2006EP12609 | Priority number, date | DE20061011670 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011670 | [2008/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104353 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1996802 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996802 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N3/36, F01N3/025 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N13/18 (EP,US);
F01N3/0253 (EP,US);
F01N3/106 (EP,US);
F01N3/36 (EP,US);
F01N2240/16 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
F01N2610/10 (EP,US);
F01N2610/107 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2009/15] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE KFZ-ABGASANLAGE, ABGASANLAGE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/49] | English: | VAPOLIZATION DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE EXHAUST SYSTEM, EXHAUST SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VAPOLIZATION DEVICE | [2008/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VAPORISATION POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE, INSTALLATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE VAPORISATION | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 15.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE BorgWarner BERU Systems GmbH Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2010
ADMISSIBLE BorgWarner BERU Systems GmbH Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | 25.05.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.02.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.12.2010 | [2020/33] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03026777 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,12,13,15,16 * page 2, line 4 - page 2, line 8; figures 1,2 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph L *; | [DA]EP1369557 (ZEUNA STAERKER KG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,5,6,10,12,13,15,16 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO02064954 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,12,16 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE19625447 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,12,16 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 57; figure 2 *; | [A]US4576617 (RENEVOT GERARD [FR]) [A] 1,12,16 * abstract * |