EP2085938 - ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR SOLAR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingeteam Power Technology, S.A. Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia Edificio 106, 2a planta 48170 Zamudio (Bizkaia) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states Ingeteam Power Technology S.A. Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia Edificio 106 - 2a planta 48170 Zamudio (Bizkaia) / ES | ||
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLOMA CALAHORRA, Javier Rio Ega, 23 - 6b 31006 Pamplona / ES | 02 /
MARROYO PALOMO, Luis Benjamin De Tudela, 25 - 1ºc 31008 Pamplona / ES | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06841704.7 | 24.11.2006 | [2009/32] | WO2006ES00651 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008062076 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085938 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/22, G08B13/186, H01L31/042 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H01L31/042 (EP,US);
G08B13/1409 (EP,US);
G08B13/1445 (EP,US);
G08B13/186 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | ANTIDIEBSTAHLEINRICHTUNG FÜR SOLARPANELS | [2009/32] | English: | ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR SOLAR PANELS | [2009/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIVOL POUR PANNEAUX SOLAIRES | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2009 | Translation filed | 21.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02073561 (ENTPR S LOKKIT INC [CA]); | [X]JP2002367046 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG); | [A]EP1587148 (APEX BP SOLAR [FR]); | [A]WO2006009078 (FURUKAWA ENGINEERING & CONSTRU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2006044136 (KOWAL SANDRA E [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2004090993 |