EP1954544 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE DETECTION OF FAULTS IN THE ROUNDNESS OF WHEELS OF RAILWAY STOCK, AND SYSTEM COMPRISING ONE SUCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GANTHA 12 Boulevard Chasseigne 86000 Poitiers / FR | [2010/29] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Signal Developpement 12, Boulevard Chasseigne 86000 Poitiers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTE, Olivier 29, rue de la Pierre Levée F-86000 Poitiers / FR | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Thibon-Littaye, Annick, et al Cabinet THIBON-LITTAYE BP 19 78164 Marly-le-Roi Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Thibon-Littaye, Annick, et al Cabinet THIBON-LITTAYE BP 19 78164 Marly-le-Roi / FR | Application number, filing date | 06841818.5 | 29.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006FR02605 | Priority number, date | FR20050012098 | 29.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0512098 | [2008/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007063209 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954544 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1954544 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B61K9/12, G01M17/10, G01B7/28 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B61K9/12 (EP);
G01B7/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTDECKUNG VON FEHLERN IN DER RUNDHEIT VON EISENBAHNRÄDERN UND SYSTEM MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2008/33] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE DETECTION OF FAULTS IN THE ROUNDNESS OF WHEELS OF RAILWAY STOCK, AND SYSTEM COMPRISING ONE SUCH DEVICE | [2008/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE DEFAUTS DE CIRCULARITE DE ROUES DE MATERIEL FERROVIAIRE ET SYSTEME COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 08.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2010 | CY | 22.09.2010 | CZ | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | IE | 22.09.2010 | IT | 22.09.2010 | LT | 22.09.2010 | LV | 22.09.2010 | NL | 22.09.2010 | PL | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | SE | 22.09.2010 | SI | 22.09.2010 | SK | 22.09.2010 | TR | 22.09.2010 | LU | 29.11.2010 | BE | 30.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | ES | 02.01.2011 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
TR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LU | 29.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
LU | 29.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1170445 (SIEMENS AG) [A] * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE1267700 (SIEMENS AG) [A] * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS58155303 (JAPAN NATIONAL RAILWAY, et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]DE3309908 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract *; | [A]WO8706203 (OEDEGAARD & DANNESKIOLD SAMSOE [DK]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US4702104 (HALLBERG KARL R S [SE]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract *; | [A]DE4439342 (DEUTSCHE BAHN AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract *; | [A]DE19804566 (KNORR BREMSE ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract *; | [A]WO0073118 (DIGI SENS AG [CH], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP1207091 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract * |