EP1955405 - ARRAY ANTENNA WITH IRREGULAR MESH AND POSSIBLE COLD REDUNDANCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/48] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states THALES 45 Rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAILLE, Gérard 7 rue de Vénasque F-31170 Tournefeuille / FR | 02 /
VOISIN, Philippe 25 rue des Ardennes F-31100 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
CAILLOCE, Yann 256 avenue de Muret F-31300 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
GUIRAUD, Cécile 171 chemin des Crêtes F-31120 Goyrans / FR | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | Esselin, Sophie, et al Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06842043.9 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006FR51232 | Priority number, date | FR20050053623 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0553623 | [2008/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060375 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955405 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955405 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/26, H01Q21/22 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
H01Q3/26 (EP,US);
H01Q21/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARRAY-ANTENNE MIT IRREGULÄREM NETZ UND POTENTIELLER KÄLTEREDUNDANZ | [2008/33] | English: | ARRAY ANTENNA WITH IRREGULAR MESH AND POSSIBLE COLD REDUNDANCY | [2008/33] | French: | ANTENNE RESEAU A MAILLAGE IRREGULIER ET EVENTUELLE REDONDANCE FROIDE | [2020/28] |
Former [2008/33] | ANTENNE RESEAU A MAILLAGE IRREGULIER ET EVENTUELLE REDONDANCE FROIDE | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2006 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | ES | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | IT | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | SE | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | TR | 25.11.2020 | IE | 27.11.2020 | LU | 27.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.11.2006 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
TR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
TR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 27.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 27.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4052723 (MILLER COLEMAN J) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0474977 (SIEMENS PLESSEY ELECTRONIC [GB]) [X] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]US6246364 (RAO SUDHAKAR K [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 7 *; | [XD]US6288673 (DOLMETA FLORENCE [FR], et al) [XD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US6374104 (CROQ FREDERIC [FR], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002140616 (KANAMALURU SRIDHAR [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2384914 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |