EP1973709 - INTEGRATED EXPLOSION PROTECTION APPARATUS FOR SUPERVISION AND CONTROL OF ADVANCED ELECTRICAL APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AS Bergerveien 12 1396 Billingstad / NO | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROGEDAL, Arnulf Jærveien 295 4322 Sandnes / NO | 02 /
TORKILDSEN, Per Ole Nellikveien 7 4340 Bryne / NO | 03 /
BREKKEN, Ole Kristian Gjesdal 4330 Ålgård / NO | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Savela, Reino Aleksi, et al ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [2017/26] |
Former [2012/38] | Savela, Reino Aleksi, et al ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Dahlstrand, Björn ABB AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property 721 78 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Dahlstrand, Björn ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 06842648.5 | 21.12.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006IB54993 | Priority number, date | SE20050002927 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: SE 0502927 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007074416 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1973709 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1973709 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B25J19/0079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2017/26] |
Former [2009/04] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EXPLOSIONSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERWACHEN UND STEUERN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2017/12] | English: | INTEGRATED EXPLOSION PROTECTION APPARATUS FOR SUPERVISION AND CONTROL OF ADVANCED ELECTRICAL APPARATUSES | [2008/40] | French: | APPAREIL INTEGRE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES EXPLOSIONS POUR LA SURVEILLANCE ET LE CONTROLE D'APPAREILS ELECTRIQUES DE POINTE | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/40] | INTEGRIERTE EXPLOSIONSSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND STEUERUNG VON FORTSCHRITTLICHEN ELEKTRISCHEN GERÄTEN | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 29.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3100502 (FORD GEORGE E, et al) [X] 12,12,12 * claim 1 * * figures 3-5 * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 4, line 14 - line 15 * * column 9, line 6 - line 11 * * column 11, line 4 - line 7 * * claim 1 * * figures 3-5 * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 4, line 14 - line 15 * * column 9, line 6 - line 11 * * column 11, line 4 - line 7 * * claim 1 * * figures 3-5 * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 4, line 14 - line 15 * * column 9, line 6 - line 11 * * column 11, line 4 - line 7 *; | [X]US3620501 (FRIEDELL MORLEY V) [X] 12,12,12 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 18 - line 21 * * column 4, line 39 - line 44 * * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 18 - line 21 * * column 4, line 39 - line 44 * * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 18 - line 21 * * column 4, line 39 - line 44 *; | [A]US4985653 (TAKAGI NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12,1-12,1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 25 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 11 * * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 25 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 11 * * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 25 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 11 *; | [Y]EP0424206 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,4,2,4,2,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 26 - line 39 * * column 5, line 38 - line 42 * * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 26 - line 39 * * column 5, line 38 - line 42 * * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 26 - line 39 * * column 5, line 38 - line 42 *; | [XY]EP0447881 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-11,1,3,5-11,1,3,5-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 45 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 29 * * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 45 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 29 * * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 45 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 29 * [Y] 2,4,2,4,2,4; | [A]US5949209 (OKAMOTO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12,1-12,1-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 34 - line 55 * * abstract * * column 5, line 34 - line 55 * * abstract ** column 5, line 34 - line 55 * |