EP1974844 - REFLOW APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tamura Corporation 1-19-43, Higashi-Oizumi Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-8511 / JP | For all designated states Tamura Fa System Corporation 2-3-1, Hirosedai Sayama-shi Saitama 350-1300 / JP | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Fumihiro TAMURA FA SYSTEM CORPORATION 2-3-1, Hirosedai Sayama-shi Saitama 350-1328 / JP | 02 /
MATSUHISA, Shoichiro TAMURA FA SYSTEM CORPORATION 2-3-1, Hirosedai Sayama-shi Saitama 350-1328 / JP | 03 /
KAWAKAMI, Takehiko TAMURA FA SYSTEM CORPORATION 2-3-1, Hirosedai Sayama-shi Saitama 350-1328 / JP | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06842867.1 | 19.12.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006JP325263 | Priority number, date | JP20060001782 | 06.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006001782 | [2008/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007077727 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974844 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/008, B23K3/04, B23K31/02 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B23K1/008 (EP,US);
H05K3/3494 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10636 (EP,US);
H05K2203/111 (EP,US);
H05K3/3442 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/10] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLOW-VORRICHTUNG | [2008/40] | English: | REFLOW APPARATUS | [2008/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE REFUSION | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2008 | Translation filed | 06.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 07.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04270062 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPH0577035 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5413164 (TESHIMA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 4, lines 3-24 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5467912 (MISHINA HARUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 4; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0834375 (SMT MASCHINENGESELLSCHAFT MBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, paragraphs 3-21; figure -; claims 1,9,10 *; | [A]US2001015368 (MUKUNO HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 12* paragraphs [0028] , [0029]; figure 1 *; | [XY]JP2002026508 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * [Y] 2 |