EP1974727 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ACUTE CEREBRAL INFARCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAJITANI, Hitoshi ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5418526 / JP | 02 /
FUNAKOSHI, Yosuke ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5418526 / JP | 03 /
KITAO, Dai ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5418526 / JP | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Schön, Christoph, et al Kroher.Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06842989.3 | 21.12.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006JP325481 | Priority number, date | JP20050369154 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005369154 | [2008/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007072902 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974727 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A61P9/10, A61P25/28 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHES MITTEL GEGEN AKUTEN ZEREBRALINFARKT | [2008/40] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ACUTE CEREBRAL INFARCT | [2008/40] | French: | AGENT THERAPEUTIQUE POUR INFARCTUS CEREBRAL AIGU | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2008 | Translation filed | 21.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SORBERA L A ET AL, "Arundic acid - Astrocyte-modulating agent treatment of stroke treatment of neurodegeneration", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (200405), vol. 29, no. 5, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 441 - 448, XP002552188 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 446, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 446, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 446, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 447, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2004.029.05.810151 | [XY] - ASANO T ET AL, "Arundic acid (ONO-2506) ameliorates delayed ischemic brain damage by preventing astrocytic overproduction of S100B.", CURRENT DRUG TARGETS. CNS AND NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS APR 2005, (200504), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1568-007X, pages 127 - 142, XP009124642 [XY] 1-15 * abstract * * page 133, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 134, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 136, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 138, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568007053544084 | [XY] - ASANO T ET AL, "Functional modulation of astrocytes by a novel agent ONO-2506 mitigates delayed infarct expansion with a wide therapeutic time window, inducing prompt neurological recovery through reduction of the extracellular level of glutamate", INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS SERIES, EXCERPTA MEDICA, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030101), vol. 1252, ISSN 0531-5131, pages 147 - 151, XP003007242 [XY] 1-15 * abstract; page 150, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0531-5131(03)00028-1 | [XY] - TATEISHI NARITO ET AL, "Astrocytic activation and delayed infarct expansion after permanent focal ischemia in rats. Part II: suppression of astrocytic activation by a novel agent (R)-(-)-2-propyloctanoic acid (ONO-2506) leads to mitigation of delayed infarct expansion and early improvement of neurologic deficits.", JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM JUN 2002, (200206), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0271-678X, pages 723 - 734, XP002552189 [XY] 1-15 * abstract * * page 727, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [PX] - FOR THE ARUNDIC ACID (ONO-2506) STROKE STUDY GROUP ET AL, "Safety and tolerability of arundic acid in acute ischemic stroke", JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING CO, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 251, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-510X, (20061221), pages 50 - 56, (20061221), XP025190710 [PX] 1-15 * abstract * * tables 2,4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jns.2006.09.001 |