EP1970394 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALLOPHANATE GROUP-CONTAINING POLYISOCYANATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/38] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALLOPHANATE GROUP-CONTAINING POLYISOCYANATE, URETHANE PREPOLYMER AND POLYURETHANE RESIN COMPOSITION | ||
[2012/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2010/10] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals Agro, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals Polyurethanes, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASANO, Shigetoshi c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 2990265 / JP | 02 /
OOSAKI, Takeshi c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 2990265 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMURA, Mitsuhiro c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 2990265 / JP | 04 /
WASHIZU, Hiroyuki c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 2990265 / JP | [2013/14] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
SASANO, Shigetoshi MITSUI CHEMICALS POLYURETHANES, INC. R & D Center 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-City Chiba 299-0265 / JP | ||
02 /
OOSAKI, Takeshi MITSUI CHEMICALS POLYURETHANES, INC. R & D Center 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-City Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIMURA, Mitsuhiro CHIBA POLYOL CORPORATION CHIBA FACTORY, TECHNICAL DEPARTMENT 12-41, Goi, Minami Kaigan Ichihara-City Chiba 290-0045 / JP | |||
04 /
WASHIZU, Hiroyuki MITSUI CHEMICALS POLYURETHANES, INC. R & D Center 1-6, Takasago Takaishi-City Osaka 592-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06843318.4 | 26.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006JP325934 | Priority number, date | JP20050380015 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005380015 | [2008/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007074831 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970394 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970394 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/78, C08G18/10, C08G18/40, C09D5/00, C09D7/12, C09D175/04, C09J11/06, C09J175/04 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
C09D5/002 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/78 (KR);
C08G18/10 (KR);
C08G18/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/227 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/282 (EP,US);
C08G18/2825 (EP,US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/40 (KR);
C08G18/4009 (EP,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/6208 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/757 (EP,US);
C08G18/7621 (EP,US);
C08G18/7837 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C09D11/102 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/40] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALLOPHANATGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDEM POLYISOCYANAT | [2012/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALLOPHANATE GROUP-CONTAINING POLYISOCYANATE | [2012/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D UN POLYISOCYANATE CONTENANT UN GROUPE ALLOPHANATE | [2012/41] |
Former [2008/38] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALLOPHANATGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDEM POLYISOCYANAT, URETHANPREPOLYMER UND POLYURETHANHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2008/38] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALLOPHANATE GROUP-CONTAINING POLYISOCYANATE, URETHANE PREPOLYMER AND POLYURETHANE RESIN COMPOSITION | ||
Former [2008/38] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D UN POLYISOCYANATE CONTENANT UN GROUPE ALLOPHANATE, D'UN PREPOLYMERE URETHANE ET D'UNE COMPOSITION DE RESINE POLYURETHANE | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2008 | Translation filed | 16.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 29.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12178828.5 / EP2520598 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.05.2013 | [2014/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |