EP1970452 - METHOD OF EXAMINING ZINC-DEFICIENT TASTE DISTURBANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon University 8-24 Kudan-Minami 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8275 / JP | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAO, Kyoichi c/o NIHON University, 8-24, Kudan-minami 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1028275 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Minoru c/o NIHON University, 8-24, Kudan-minami 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1028275 / JP | 03 /
ONODA, Keiko c/o NIHON University, 8-24, Kudan-minami 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1028275 / JP | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06843734.2 | 27.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006JP326363 | Priority number, date | JP20050376717 | 27.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005376717 | [2008/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007074937 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970452 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG DER GESCHMACKSSTÖRUNG MIT ZINKMANGEL | [2008/38] | English: | METHOD OF EXAMINING ZINC-DEFICIENT TASTE DISTURBANCE | [2008/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXAMEN D'UN TROUBLE DU GOÛT LIÉ À UNE CARENCE EN ZINC | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2008 | Translation filed | 15.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2006001544 (UNIV NIHON [JP], et al) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document * * example 3; table 3 * * claims 1-18 *; | [Y] - TAZAKI MASAKAZU ET AL, "Leukemia case in patient with taste dysfunction.", THE BULLETIN OF TOKYO DENTAL COLLEGE MAY 2005, (200505), vol. 46, no. 1-2, ISSN 0040-8891, pages 33 - 36, XP002518610 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 33, column 1 * * page 35, column 1, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2209/tdcpublication.46.33 | [Y] - O'NION J V ET AL, "Effect of zinc supplementation on red blood cell zinc, serum zinc, taste acuity, and dietary intake in zinc deficient dialysis patients", DIALYSIS AND TRANSPLANTATION 1978 US, (1978), vol. 7, no. 12, ISSN 0090-2934, pages 1208 - 1210+1213, XP002518611 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - YOSHIKAWA T, "Experimental study on drug-induced taste disorders in rats", NIHON UNIVERSITY JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 199712 JP, (199712), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 0546-0352, pages 353 - 367, XP002518612 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - TANAKA MASAMI, "Secretory function of the salivary gland in patients with taste disorders or xerostomia: correlation with zinc deficiency.", ACTA OTO-LARYNGOLOGICA. SUPPLEMENTUM 2002, (2002), no. 546, ISSN 0365-5237, pages 134 - 141, XP009113479 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00016480260046526 |