EP1971897 - MAGNETO-OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSURAGAWA, Tadao 9-17, Hibarigaoka 5-chome Zama-shi, Kanagawa 2280003 / JP | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06843760.7 | 27.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006JP326391 | Priority number, date | JP20060002214 | 10.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006002214 | JP20060292224 | 27.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006292224 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007080816 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1971897 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/09 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G02F1/09 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/093 (EP,US);
G02F2203/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/08] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETOOPTISCHE ANORDNUNG | [2008/39] | English: | MAGNETO-OPTICAL DEVICE | [2008/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF MAGNÉTO-OPTIQUE | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 12.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 21.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1114814 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6243193 (KATSURAGAWA TADAO [JP]) [X] 1,5-8,10 * column 4, lines 7-9,45-53 * * column 5, lines 45-61 * * column 6, lines 1-12 * * column 7, lines 12-15 * * column 8, lines 53-57; figures 1,2A * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4; | [A]JP2004219415 (RIKOGAKU SHINKOKAI) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005158988 (LEE SEUNG-HEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2005221841 (FDK CORP, et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0017] , [0024]; figures 4B,6B * |