EP1946601 - SELECT DIVERSITY FOR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/07] |
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÅGFORS, Mats Ravalsvägen 8C 13 FIN-02400 Kyrkslätt / FI | 02 /
TORSNER, Johan Skogstorpsvägen 2 C9 FIN-02430 Masaby / FI | 03 /
CHAKRABORTY, Shyam Akselinpolku 7 I 73 FIN-02230 Espoo / FI | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/07] |
Former [2008/30] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06844024.7 | 16.10.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006SE50403 | Priority number, date | SE20050002311 | 19.10.2005 Original published format: SE 0502311 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007046764 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946601 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946601 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/18, H04B7/26, H04B7/02, H04L1/18 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
H04B7/022 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/1867 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | H04Q7/38, H04B7/26, H04B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWAHLDIVERSITÄT FÜR DIE FUNKKOMMUNIKATION | [2008/30] | English: | SELECT DIVERSITY FOR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS | [2008/30] | French: | DIVERSITE DE SELECTION POUR RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 01.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2006 | AT | 17.02.2016 | BE | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | IE | 16.10.2016 | LU | 16.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.10.2006 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.10.2006 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0171521 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]US2002067706 (BAUTZ GREGOR [SE], et al); | [A]US2004116143 (LOVE ROBERT T [US], et al); | [A]WO2005079099 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | International search | [A]US2005111521 (YUN YU-SUK [KR], et al); | [A]WO2005079099 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | by applicant | US2002067706 | US2004116143 | WO2005079099 |