EP1956975 - MRI-GUIDED LOCALIZATION AND/OR LEAD PLACEMENT SYSTEMS, RELATED METHODS, DEVICES AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surgi-Vision, Inc. 200 N Cobb Parkway, Suite 140 Marrietta, GA 30062 / US | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARMARKAR, Parag V. 8439 Oakton Lane, Apt. 3A Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | 02 /
JENKINS, Kimble 3540 Lily Lane Memphis, TN 38111 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
KARMARKAR, Parag V. 7660 Woodpark Lane 401 Columbia, MD 21046 / US | ||
02 /
JENKINS, Kimble 3540 Lily Lane Memphis, TN 38111 / US | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds, Yorkshire LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06844645.9 | 29.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006US45752 | Priority number, date | US20050740353P | 29.11.2005 Original published format: US 740353 P | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007064739 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1956975 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0476, A61B5/055, A61B19/00, G01R33/28, G01R33/341, A61N1/18 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/369 (EP);
A61B5/37 (US);
A61B5/6847 (US);
A61B5/6864 (EP,US);
A61B5/6865 (EP,US);
A61B5/7435 (US);
A61B90/14 (US);
A61M39/08 (US);
A61N1/0529 (EP,US);
A61N1/0534 (EP,US);
A61N1/0539 (EP,US);
A61N1/08 (US);
G01R33/285 (US);
G01R33/286 (EP,US);
G01R33/287 (EP,US);
G01R33/34084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00039 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2090/374 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
A61N1/086 (EP,US);
A61N1/3718 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | MRI-GESTEUERTE LOKALISIERUNGS- UND/ODER GEFÜHRTE PLATZIERUNGSSYSTEME, ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN, GERÄTE UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE | [2008/34] | English: | MRI-GUIDED LOCALIZATION AND/OR LEAD PLACEMENT SYSTEMS, RELATED METHODS, DEVICES AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS | [2008/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE MISE EN PLACE DE DÉRIVATION ET/OU DE LOCALISATION GUIDÉS PAR IRM ET PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS ET PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES ASSOCIÉS | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 18.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP09154960.0 / EP2062530 | EP10181467.1 / EP2305109 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9852064 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [A] 9,10* page 26, line 6 - page 33, line 26 *; | [X]DE10029736 (DAUM GMBH I INS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002049451 (PARMER KARI [US], et al) [Y] 3,13,23 * paragraph [0088] *; | [XAY]US2002052610 (SKAKOON JAMES G [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [A] 12 [Y] 3,5,6,13-16,19,21,23; | [Y]WO03102614 (SURGIVISION INC [US]) [Y] 6,15,16,21 * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] , [0065] *; | [Y]US2004215279 (HOUBEN RICHARD P M [BE], et al) [Y] 5,14,19 * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2004228796 (TALPADE DNYANESH [US]) [A] 9,10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0027] , [0028] * |