EP1963353 - WOOD AND CELL WALL GENE MICROARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArborGen, LLC 180 Westvaco Road, P.O. Box 840001 Summerville, S.C. 29484 / US | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOKSBERG, Leonard N. c/o ArborGen, LLC P.O. Box 840001 180 Westvaco Road Summerville, SC 29484 / US | 02 /
FROST, Michael J. c/o ArborGen, LLC P.O. Box 840001 180 Westvaco Road Summerville, SC 29484 / US | 03 /
FORSTER, Richard L. c/o ArborGen, LLC P.O. Box 840001 180 Westvaco Road Summerville, SC 29484 / US | 04 /
HIGGINS, Colleen c/o ArborGen, LLC P.O. Box 840001 180 Westvaco Road Summerville, SC 29484 / US | 05 /
ROTTMAN, William H. ArborGen, LLC 180 Westvaco Road P.O. Box 840001 Summerville, SC 29484 / US | 06 /
NORRIS-CANEDA, Kim ArborGen, LLC 180 Westvaco Road P.O. Box 840001 Summerville, SC 29484 / US | [2009/14] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
BLOKSBERG, Leonard N. Genesis Research and Development Corporation Limit ed One Fox Street Parnell, 1052 / NZ | ||
02 /
FROST, Michael J. Genesis Research and Development Corporation Limit ed One Fox Street Parnell, 1052 / NZ | |||
03 /
FORSTER, Richard L. Genesis Research and Development Corporation Limit ed One Fox Street Parnell, 1052 / NZ | |||
04 /
HIGGINS, Colleen Genesis Research and Development Corporation Limit ed One Fox Street Parnell, 1052 / NZ | |||
05 /
ROTTMAN, William H. ArborGen, LLC 180 Westvaco Road P.O. Box 840001 Summerville, SC 29484 / US | |||
06 /
NORRIS-CANEDA, Kim ArborGen, LLC 180 Westvaco Road P.O. Box 840001 Summerville, SC 29484 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06844832.3 | 06.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US46369 | Priority number, date | US20050742926P | 06.12.2005 Original published format: US 742926 P | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007067525 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1963353 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, C07H21/04, C12N15/82 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6895 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/13 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLZ UND ZELLWAND-GEN-MIKROARRAY | [2008/36] | English: | WOOD AND CELL WALL GENE MICROARRAY | [2008/36] | French: | MICRORESEAU DE GENE DE LIGNINE ET DE PAROI CELLULAIRE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 03.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2004163146 (PHILLIPS JONATHAN [NZ], et al); | [A]US2005120408 (REUBER T L [US], et al); | [A]US2004214272 (LA ROSA THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]WO2005001051 (ARBORGEN LLC [US], et al) |