EP1958295 - IMPLANT CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HeartWare, Inc. 3351 Executive Way Miramar, Florida 33025 / US | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMEZ, Daniel 5921 Sawyer Drive Pearland, TX 77581 / US | 02 /
INDRAVUDH, Vitrote 28727 Howard Marie CT Santa Clarita, CA 91390 / US | 03 /
MARQUIS, Richard, A. 14445 SW 108th ST. Miami, FL 33186 / US | 04 /
SHAMBAUGH, Charles, R. 707 Zamora Avenue Coral Gables, FL 33134 / US | 05 /
LAROSE, Jeffrey, A. 10937 N.W. 61st Court Parkland, FL 33076 / US | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2010/40] | Peters, Hajo, et al Albihns Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Peters, Hajo, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Peters, Hajo, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06845159.0 | 08.12.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006US47133 | Priority number, date | US20050298410 | 08.12.2005 Original published format: US 298410 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007067792 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1958295 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958295 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
A61M60/122 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,KR,US);
A61M60/211 (KR);
A61M60/216 (EP,US);
A61M60/857 (KR);
A61M60/867 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | H01R13/514 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTAT-STECKVERBINDER | [2008/34] | English: | IMPLANT CONNECTOR | [2008/34] | French: | CONNECTEUR D'IMPLANT | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 18.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2006 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | IE | 08.12.2014 | LU | 08.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.12.2006 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 26.11.2014 | |
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 26.11.2014 | |
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5084064 (BARAK JACOB H [IL], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 44 - line 50; figures 1-3A *; | [Y]US5562688 (RIZA EROL D [US]) [Y] 1-19 * figures 1,4,9 *; | [A]WO0047270 (ABIOMED INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 6 - page 8; figures 1-10 ** page 10 *; | [Y]US2004002624 (YU LONG SHENG [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] , [0036]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2004122514 (FOGARTY THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0105] , [0110]; figures 1-15,57 * | International search | [Y]US5354331 (SCHACHAR RONALD A [US]); | [Y]US2002058994 (HILL J DONALD [US], et al); | [Y]US6458163 (SLEMKER TRACY C [US], et al); | [Y]US2004007515 (GEYER FREDERICK J [US]); | [Y]US2004171905 (YU LONG SHENG [US], et al) |