EP1957786 - EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION COOLER BYPASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. Patent Department, 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOERGL, Volker 1601 N. Hadley Road Ortonville, MI 48462 / US | 02 /
SHUTTY, John 6899 Langle Ct. Clarkston, MI 48346 / US | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06845160.8 | 08.12.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006US47134 | Priority number, date | US20050748894P | 09.12.2005 Original published format: US 748894 P | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007067793 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957786 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F02D41/0065 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/06 (EP,US);
F02M26/25 (EP,US);
F02M26/33 (EP,US);
F02M26/38 (EP,US);
F02M26/44 (EP,US);
F02M26/47 (EP,US);
F01N2340/06 (EP,US);
F02B29/0406 (EP,US);
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
F02M26/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/02] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNGSKÜHLERBYPASS | [2008/34] | English: | EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION COOLER BYPASS | [2008/34] | French: | DERIVATION DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE RECIRCULATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 10.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08135519 (PETROLEUM ENERGY CENTER FOUND, et al) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]WO9630635 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 4, line 22 - line L * * page 6, line 8 - page 8, line 3 * * page 9, line 1 - line 19 *; | [A]JPH1193781 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1,14 * abstract ** page 4, paragraph 18 - paragraph 20 *; | [XAY]JP2000097017 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-14,16-18 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 44 - paragraph 46 * * page 12, paragraph 94 - page 14, paragraph 111 * [A] 3,9,15,20 [Y] 19; | [YA]DE19924920 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 19 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 15 * * column 1, line 22 - line 41 * * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 39 * [A] 1-18,20; | [YA]WO0216750 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US], et al) [Y] 15 * abstract * * page 19 * [A] 1-14,16-20; | [A]US6367256 (MCKEE HEATHER [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 59 *; | [XA]JP2004156572 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [X] 1,8,10,14,16-18,20 * abstract * [A] 2-7,9,11-13,15,19; | [XAY]US2005028796 (TUSSING BRIAN LEE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,10,14,16-18,20 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 37 * * page 4, paragraph 53 - page 5, paragraph 55 * * page 6, paragraph 64 - page 7, paragraph 79 * [A] 2,4-7,9,11-13,19 [Y] 15 |