EP1972030 - RECONFIGURABLE PAYLOAD USING NON-FOCUSED REFLECTOR ANTENNA FOR HIEO AND GEO SATELLITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation (Maryland Corp.) 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda MD 20817 / US | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Sudhakar, K. 125 Livery Drive Churchville, PA 18966 / US | 02 /
PECK, Stephen, R. 1088 Drew Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | 03 /
TANG, Minh 1116 Daffodil Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | 04 /
WANG, Jim 121 Edwards Drive Churchville, PA 18966 / US | 05 /
BROWN, David, M. 1171 Shannon Road Upper Makefield, PA 18940 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06845366.1 | 14.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US47609 | Priority number, date | US20060758674P | 13.01.2006 Original published format: US 758674 P | US20060480497 | 05.07.2006 Original published format: US 480497 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087038 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1972030 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1972030 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/00, H01Q19/10, H01Q19/12, H01Q19/17, H01Q25/00 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
H01Q19/12 (EP,US);
H01Q19/10 (EP,US);
H01Q19/17 (EP,US);
H01Q25/007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | H01Q13/00, H01Q19/10, H01Q19/12, H01Q19/17 | ||
Former IPC [2008/39] | H01Q13/00 | Designated contracting states | FR [2009/07] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UMKONFIGURIERBARE NUTZINFORMATIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER NICHTFOKUSSIERTEN REFLEKTORANTENNE FÜR HIEO- UND GEO-SATELLITEN | [2008/39] | English: | RECONFIGURABLE PAYLOAD USING NON-FOCUSED REFLECTOR ANTENNA FOR HIEO AND GEO SATELLITES | [2008/39] | French: | CHARGE RECONFIGURABLE UTILISANT UNE ANTENNE DE REFLECTEUR NON CIBLEE POUR DES SATELLITES HIEO ET GEO | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 14.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0420739 (EUROP AGENCE SPATIALE [FR]) [Y] 1,5-8,11,15-18 * column 7, line 34 - column 9, line 42 * * figures 1A-6B * * abstract *; | [A]EP1170823 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-3,5-13,15-20 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 28 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [Y]US2004189538 (RAO SUDHAKAR K [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-13,15-20 * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 3, paragraph 42 * * figures 1-5 * * abstract *; | [Y]US2005052333 (RAO SUDHAKAR K [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-13,15-20 * page 3, paragraph 36 - page 4, paragraph 41 * * figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [A] - IZURU NAITO ET AL, "A METHOD OF DESIGNING FEED-ARRAY EXCITATION COEFFICIENTS FOR ARRAY-FED REFLECTOR-TYPE RECONFIGURABLE BEAM ANTENNAS", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (19960901), vol. 79, no. 9, ISSN 8756-6621, pages 81 - 90, XP000623862 [A] 1,11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2005140558 (JUNG YOUNG-BAE [KR], et al); | [Y]US6456252 (GOYETTE GUY [US]); | [Y]US5936592 (RAMANUJAM PARTHASARATHY [US], et al); | [Y]US5422595 (LOTT JOEL M [US]) |