EP1974056 - CHARACTERIZING GENOMIC REARRANGEMENTS AT THE HER2 AND TOP2A LOCI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/40] | USE OF ROMA FOR CHARACTERIZING GENOMIC REARRANGEMENTS | ||
[2015/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wigler, Michael H. 52 Snake Hill Road Cold Spring Harbour, NY 11724 / US | For all designated states Hicks, James B. Cold Spring Harbour Laboratory One Bungtown Road Cold Spring Harbour, NY 11274 / US | For all designated states Norton, Larry 103 East 84th Street, Apt. 8A New York, NY 10028 / US | For all designated states Zetterberg, Anders P. Lokevagen 8 182 61 Djursholm / SE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06845431.3 | 14.12.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006US47732 | Priority number, date | US20050751382P | 14.12.2005 Original published format: US 751382 P | US20060857921P | 08.11.2006 Original published format: US 857921 P | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007070640 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1974056 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | CHARAKTERISIERUNG GENOMISCHER UMORDNUNGEN AN DEN HER2 UND TOP2A LOCI | [2015/27] | English: | CHARACTERIZING GENOMIC REARRANGEMENTS AT THE HER2 AND TOP2A LOCI | [2015/27] | French: | LA CARACTERISATION DE REARRANGEMENTS GENOMIQUES AUX LOCI HER2 ET TOP2A | [2015/27] |
Former [2008/40] | VERWENDUNG VON ROMA ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG GENOMISCHER UMORDNUNGEN | ||
Former [2008/40] | USE OF ROMA FOR CHARACTERIZING GENOMIC REARRANGEMENTS | ||
Former [2008/40] | UTILISATION DE LA TECHNIQUE ROMA POUR LA CARACTERISATION DE REARRANGEMENTS GENOMIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/18] | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003082606 (LEBO ROGER V [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * claims 1-35 *; | [X] - HICKS D G ET AL, "The incidence of topoisomerase II-alpha genomic alterations in adenocarcinoma of the breast and their relationship to human epidermal growth factor receptor-2 gene amplification: A fluorescence in situ hybridization study", HUMAN PATHOLOGY, SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200504), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0046-8177, pages 348 - 356, XP004863328 [X] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.humpath.2005.01.016 | [PAD] - HICKS JAMES ET AL, "Novel patterns of genome rearrangement and their association with survival in breast cancer.", GENOME RESEARCH DEC 2006, (200612), vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1465 - 1479, XP002439306 [PAD] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.5460106 | [AD] - LUCITO ROBERT ET AL, "Representational oligonucleotide microarray analysis: a high-resolution method to detect genome copy number variation.", GENOME RESEARCH OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 13, no. 10, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 2291 - 2305, XP002439307 [AD] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.1349003 | Examination | - SELZER REBECCA R ET AL, "Analysis of chromosome breakpoints in neuroblastoma at sub-kilobase resolution using fine-tiling oligonucleotide array CGH", GENES CHROMOSOMES & CANCER, (200511), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 1045-2257, pages 305 - 319 |