EP1963433 - ANNULAR OR TUBULAR SHAPED ARTICLES OF NOVEL POLYMER BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Sabic Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODLE, Roy Ray 7401 Saverkraut Lane North Mt. Vernon, IN 47620 / US | 02 /
SHETH, Kapil Chandrakant 331 Hope Court Evansville, IN 47712 / US | 03 /
DONAVAN, Michael Stephen 706 Sunflower Cr. Evansville, IN 47712 / US | 04 /
SANNER, Mark A. 6166 Laurel Ridge Drive Newburgh, IN 47630 / US | 05 /
SINGH, Rajendra Kashinath 8500 Aster Lane Evansville, IN 47712 / US | 06 /
GALLUCCI, Robert Russell 1109 Tanglewood Drive Mt. Vernon, IN 47620 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2009/27] |
Former [2008/36] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 06845468.5 | 14.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US47800 | Priority number, date | US20050314542 | 21.12.2005 Original published format: US 314542 | US20060383639 | 16.05.2006 Original published format: US 383639 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007075365 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1963433 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L79/08 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
C08L79/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/00 (KR);
F16L9/12 (EP,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,US);
B29K2079/085 (EP,US);
B29L2023/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L67/03 (EP,US);
C08L83/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L79/08, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L79/08, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L79/08, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L79/08, C08L2666/20 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RING- ODER RÖHRENFÖRMIGE ARTIKEL AUS NEUARTIGEN POLYMERMISCHUNGEN | [2008/36] | English: | ANNULAR OR TUBULAR SHAPED ARTICLES OF NOVEL POLYMER BLENDS | [2008/36] | French: | ARTICLES DE FORME ANNULAIRE OU TUBULAIRE OBTENUS A PARTIR DE NOUVEAUX MELANGES POLYMERES | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 05.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0881263 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 55 - line 56 * * page 17, line 26 - line 27 * * example 3 * [Y] 1,7; | [Y] - BRANDOM D K ET AL, "NEW METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH-PERFORMANCE THERMOPLASTIC POLYMERIC FOAMS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. NEW YORK, US, (19971121), vol. 66, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 1543 - 1550, XP000822791 [Y] 1,7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4628(19971121)66:8<1543::AID-APP15>3.0.CO;2-4 |