Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9092383 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2015 | B2 | US2013080599 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213360947 | 30.01.2012 | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | US201213680244 | 19.11.2012 | US61249309 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8315555 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2012 | B2 | US2012129446 | 24.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213360947 | 30.01.2012 | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | US61249309 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8112032 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2012 | B2 | US2010049835 | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | US61249309 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009521185 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | WO2006US47825 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2299654 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | EP06845481 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1964365 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2011 | B1 | EP1964365 | 03.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | WO2006US47825 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE520238T | 15.08.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | WO2006US47825 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1122664 | 22.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | WO2006US47825 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1964365T | 31.05.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | WO2006US47825 | 13.12.2006 | EP06845481 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007075376 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7702279 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2010 | B2 | US2007169115 | 19.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015029285 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013243713 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012235471 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346965 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102984041 | 20.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US31429105 | 20.12.2005 | Type | Divisional application | EP2299654 |