EP1961089 - SPARK PLUG WITH MULTI-LAYER FIRING TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYKOWSKI, James, D. 1609 W. Dean Road Temperance, MI 48182 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2008/35] | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06846355.3 | 20.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006US61106 | Priority number, date | US20050737963P | 18.11.2005 Original published format: US 737963 P | US20060772278P | 10.02.2006 Original published format: US 772278 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007062353 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961089 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961089 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/00, H01T13/39 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
H01T13/39 (EP,US);
H01T13/04 (KR);
H01T13/20 (EP,US);
H01T21/02 (EP,US);
H01R13/03 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49147 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49169 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | H01T13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/28] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÜNDKERZE MIT EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ZÜNDUNGSSPITZE | [2008/35] | English: | SPARK PLUG WITH MULTI-LAYER FIRING TIP | [2008/35] | French: | BOUGIE A POINTE D'ALLUMAGE MULTICOUCHE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 13.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.01.2014 | [2016/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4853582 (SATO YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 14 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 21; figures 12, 13 *[A] 1,10 | International search | [Y]US3958144 (FRANKS HARRY E); | [X]US2002074920 (CHIU RANDOLPH KWOK-KIN [US], et al); | [Y]US2002130602 (KANAO KEIJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004263041 (TINWELL PAUL [GB], et al) | by applicant | US4853582 |