EP2004786 - CLEANING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: PT | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUZI, Alexandrine 39, rue Walthere Jamar B-4430 Ans / BE | 02 /
BROZE, Guy 2, rue des Enfants B-4460 Grace-Hollogne / BE | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06846417.1 | 30.11.2006 | [2008/52] | WO2006US61403 | Priority number, date | US20050740885P | 30.11.2005 Original published format: US 740885 P | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007065127 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004786 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2004786 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/83, C11D1/94, C11D3/20, C11D3/43, C11D17/00 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
C11D17/0021 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/94 (EP,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTEL UND VERFAHREN | [2008/52] | English: | CLEANING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2008/52] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS ET MÉTHODES DE NETTOYAGE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | IE | 30.11.2010 | LU | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | HU | 14.04.2011 | [2015/32] |
Former [2012/44] | BE | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 30.11.2010 | ||
LU | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | BE | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | BE | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | BE | 13.10.2010 | |
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | LT | 13.10.2010 | |
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 13.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2318801 (AMWAY CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,12-15 * example -; claim 11 *; | [X]US5840676 (DRAPIER JULIEN [BE]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,11,14 * example -; claims 1-11 *; | [XA]US6004920 (POLLACK CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,11,14 * column 10, line 13 - line 30; examples III-I; claim 1 * * column 9, line 1 - line 34 *[A] 16-19; | [XA]US6030935 (DRAPIER JULIEN [BE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-12,14,15 * examples 1A-B,2A-E; claim - * * example 2B * [A] 16-19; | [XA]US2005192196 (HUTTON HOWARD DAVID III [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10,11,14,20 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048]; claim 1 * [A] 16-19 | Examination | WO0071667 | FR2879172 |