|
25.11.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |