Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1966974 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2015 | B1 | EP1966974 | 10.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006FR02836 | 21.12.2006 | FR0513506 | 30.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007077348 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2007 | B1 | WO2007077348 | 12.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0513506 | 30.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2895856 | 25.07.2008 | B1 | FR2895856 | 06.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0513506 | 30.12.2005 |