EP1969403 - LUMINOUS STRUCTURE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE, ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOUSSE, Didier 27 rue du Maréchal Foch F-95150 Taverny / FR | 02 /
NUGUE, Jean-Clément 53-55 avenue de Gouvieux Lys Chantilly F-60260 Lamorlaye / FR | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Cardin, Elise Département de la Propriété Industrielle Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Cardin, Elise Département de la Propriété Industrielle Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06847220.8 | 27.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006FR51431 | Priority number, date | FR20050013446 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0513446 | [2008/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007074318 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1969403 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1969403 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
G02B6/0021 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10541 (EP);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
G02B6/0091 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTSTRUKTUR MIT MINDESTENS EINER LEUCHTDIODE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN | [2008/38] | English: | LUMINOUS STRUCTURE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE, ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS APPLICATIONS | [2008/38] | French: | STRUCTURE LUMINEUSE COMPORTANT AU MOINS UNE DIODE ELECTROLUMINESCENTE, SA FABRICATION ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 14.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | IE | 09.06.2010 | LT | 09.06.2010 | LV | 09.06.2010 | PL | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | GR | 10.09.2010 | IS | 09.10.2010 | HU | 10.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
HU | 10.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002001192 (SUEHIRO YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1-30* abstract *; | [X]US2004070989 (AMANO YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-30 * abstract * |