Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7439496 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2008 | B2 | US2008230689 | 25.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41706306 | 04.05.2006 | US67819205 | 06.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4899012B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2012 | B2 | JP2008541038 | 20.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006IB03980 | 04.05.2006 | US67819205 | 06.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1877382 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | B1 | EP1877382 | 18.08.2010 | A4 | EP1877382 | 16.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IB03980 | 04.05.2006 | US67819205 | 06.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2607576 | 09.07.2013 | C | CA2607576 | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IB03980 | 04.05.2006 | US67819205 | 06.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007085898 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2008 | A3 | WO2007085898 | 02.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US67819205 | 06.05.2005 |