EP1877382 - Method of using isobutyramide as an ionization reagent in IMS-spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/03] | IMPROVED CHEMICAL IDENTIFICATION OF PEROXIDE-BASED EXPLOSIVES | ||
[2012/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Detection Inc. 7030 Century Ave. Mississauga Ontario L4W1 VI / CA | [2012/48] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Smiths detection INC. 7030 Century Ave. Missauga Ontario L4W1 VI / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOTT, William, Ronald 5220 15th Sideroad K KIng City, Ontario, L78 1K4 / CA | 02 /
NACSON, Sabatino 93 Crown Heights Crescent Thornhill, Ontario L4J 5T1 / CA | 03 /
EUSTATIU, Gabriela, Iulia 2881 Windwwod Dr. Streetsville, Ontario L5N 2K9 / CA | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/42] | 01 /
STOTT, William, Ronald 5220 15th Sideroad K KIng City, Ontario, L78 1K4 / CA | ||
02 /
NACSON, Sabatino 93 Crown Heights Crescent Thornhill, Ontario L4J 5T1 / CA | |||
03 /
EUSTATIU, Gabriela, Iulia 2881 Windwwod Dr. Streetsville, Ontario L5N 2K9 / CA | |||
Former [2008/03] | 01 /
STOTT, William, Ronald 5220 Fifteenth Nobleton, Ontario, L0G 1N0 / CA | ||
02 /
NACSON, Sabatino 93 Crown Heights Crescent Thornhill, Ontario L4J 5T1 / CA | |||
03 /
EUSTATIU, Gabriela, Iulia 2881 Windwwod Dr. Streetsville, Ontario L5N 2K9 / CA | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55/Roßstr. 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06847251.3 | 04.05.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006IB03980 | Priority number, date | US20050678192P | 06.05.2005 Original published format: US 678192 P | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007085898 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1877382 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1877382 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/64, G01N27/62, G01N33/22, C07C233/05, C07D213/82 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
G01N27/622 (EP,US);
G01N33/0057 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | C07C233/05, G01N33/22, G01N27/62, C07D213/82 | ||
Former IPC [2008/03] | C07D213/82, C07C233/05, G01N27/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Isobutyramide als Ionisierungreagenz in der IMS-Spektrometrie | [2012/17] | English: | Method of using isobutyramide as an ionization reagent in IMS-spectrometry | [2012/17] | French: | Utilisation de isobutyramide comme un réactif d'ionisation en spectrométrie de mobilité ionique | [2012/17] |
Former [2008/03] | VERBESSERTE CHEMISCHE IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON SPRENGSTOFFEN AUF PEROXIDBASIS | ||
Former [2008/03] | IMPROVED CHEMICAL IDENTIFICATION OF PEROXIDE-BASED EXPLOSIVES | ||
Former [2008/03] | IDENTIFICATION CHIMIQUE AMÉLIORÉE D'EXPLOSIFS À BASE DE PEROXYDE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 18.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2006 | AT | 28.11.2012 | BE | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | IT | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | NL | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SE | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | ES | 11.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | IE | 04.05.2013 | LU | 04.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.05.2006 | |
AT | 28.11.2012 | ||
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
LU | 04.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0692712 (ION TRACK INSTR [US]) [I] 1,4-8,11,12 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 8; figure 1 *; | [I]US5796099 (JACKSON RONALD A [CA]) [I] 1,4-8,11,12 * column 8, lines 10-28; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO2004010132 (GETTERS SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5420424 (CARNAHAN BYRON L [US], et al); | [A] - MOORE, REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (2004), vol. 75, no. 8, pages 2499 - 2512, XP012071970 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1771493 | [A] - EVANS ET AL., JOURNAL OF FORENSIC SCIENCES, (1986), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 1119 - 1125, XP008131395 | [A] - BUTTIGIEG ET AL., FORENSIC SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 135, pages 53 - 59, XP008133432 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0379-0738(03)00175-0 |