EP1961100 - MULTI-OBJECT PROTECTION, CONTROL, AND MONITORING IN THE SAME INTELLIGENT ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSMAN, Sören Skälbygatan 73 S-724 76 Västerås / SE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Legal Affairs and Compliance/ Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 06847305.7 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006IB04103 | Priority number, date | US20050750388P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750388 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007069096 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961100 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
H02J13/0004 (EP,US);
H02J13/00002 (EP,US);
G01R19/2513 (EP,US);
H02H7/261 (EP,US);
H02J13/00001 (EP,US);
H02J13/00017 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y04S10/18 (EP,US);
Y04S10/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | SCHUTZ, STEUERUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG MEHRERER OBJEKTE AUF EINEM EINZIGEN INTELLIGENTEN ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄT | [2008/35] | English: | MULTI-OBJECT PROTECTION, CONTROL, AND MONITORING IN THE SAME INTELLIGENT ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2008/35] | French: | PROTECTION, COMMANDE ET SURVEILLANCE D'OBJETS MULTIPLES DANS UN MEME DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE INTELLIGENT | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 15.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004172207 (HANCOCK MARTIN A [CA], et al) [I] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0046] *; | [I]US2004183522 (GUNN COLIN N [CA], et al) [I] 1-17* paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0038] , [0081] , [0083] , [0092] * | International search | [A]US2004138834 (BLACKETT ANDREW W [CA], et al); | [X]US2004172207 (HANCOCK MARTIN A [CA], et al); | [X]US2004183522 (GUNN COLIN N [CA], et al); | [A]US2005097373 (STOUPIS JAMES [US], et al) |