EP1971427 - VISIBLE LIGHT CURING SYSTEMS, METHODS FOR REDUCING HEALTH RISKS TO INDIVIDUALS EXPOSED TO SYSTEMS DESIGNED TO CURE CURABLE COMPOSITIONS BY EXPOSURE TO RADIATION, METHODS FOR BONDING SUBSTRATES AND VISIBLE LIGHT CURING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel US IP LLC One Henkel Way Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | [2014/33] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Henkel Corporation 1001 Trout Brook Crossing Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONARSKI, Mark M. 4 Merritt Lane Old Saybrook, CT 06475 / US | 02 /
PEREZ, Edwin R. 77 Summitt Street Newington, CT 06111 / US | 03 /
MAANDI, Eerik 40 Fern Street Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | 04 /
KADZIELA, Vic 30 Featherbed Lane Branford, CT 06405 / US | 05 /
HEMSEN, Steven J. 73 Deerbrooke Circle Southington, CT 06489 / US | 06 /
BELEK, Ronald E. 56 Parker Bridge Road Coventry, CT 06238 / US | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
KONARSKI, Mark M. 4 Merritt Lane Old Saybrook, CT 06475 / US | ||
02 /
PEREZ, Edwin R. 77 Summitt Street Newington, CT 06111 / US | |||
03 /
MAANDI, Eerik 40 Fern Street Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | |||
04 /
KADZIELA, Vic 35C Grimes Road, Apt. 211C Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | |||
05 /
HEMSEN, Steven J. 73 Deerbrooke Circle Southington, CT 06489 / US | |||
06 /
BELEK, Ronald E. 56 Parker Bridge Road Coventry, CT 06238 / US | Representative(s) | Davepon, Björn, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Davepon, Björn, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06847658.9 | 14.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US47756 | Priority number, date | US20050305005 | 19.12.2005 Original published format: US 305005 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007078851 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1971427 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/06, C09J175/16 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
C09D133/26 (EP,US);
B01J19/12 (KR);
B01J19/08 (KR);
C08F290/067 (EP,US);
C08G18/672 (EP,US);
C09D133/14 (EP,US);
C09J133/14 (EP,US);
C09J5/00 (KR);
C08L2312/06 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2852 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/26, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | B01J19/12, C09J5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | DURCH SICHTBARES LICHT HÄRTENDE SYSTEME, VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER GESUNDHEITSRISIKEN FÜR SYSTEMEN, DIE ZUR HÄRTUNG VON HÄRTBAREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DURCH EINWIRKUNG VON STRAHLUNG KONZIPIERT SIND, AUSGESETZTE PERSONEN, VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON SUBSTRATEN UND DURCH SICHTBARES LICHT HÄRTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2008/39] | English: | VISIBLE LIGHT CURING SYSTEMS, METHODS FOR REDUCING HEALTH RISKS TO INDIVIDUALS EXPOSED TO SYSTEMS DESIGNED TO CURE CURABLE COMPOSITIONS BY EXPOSURE TO RADIATION, METHODS FOR BONDING SUBSTRATES AND VISIBLE LIGHT CURING COMPOSITIONS | [2008/39] | French: | SYSTEMES DE POLYMERISATION PAR RAYONNEMENT VISIBLE, PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LES RISQUES POUR LA SANTE DES PERSONNES EXPOSEES A DES SYSTEME CONÇUS POUR POLYMERISER DES COMPOSITION POLYMERISABLES PAR EXPOSITION A DES RAYONNEMENTS, PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LIER DES SUBSTRATS ET COMPOSITION DE POLYMERISATION PAR RAYONNEMEN | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2216136 (KENDALL & CO [US]) [X] 1,14* page 19, line 1 - line 10; claim - * | International search | [A]US6025026 (SMITH ROBERT A [US], et al); | [X]US6734221 (MISIAK HANNS R [IE]); | [X]US6906112 (WOJCIAK STAN [US], et al); | [X]US6921454 (SHI WEITONG [US], et al) |