EP1969047 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MODIFIED METAL OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHANDARKAR, Suhas 3955 Vineyard Avenue, Apartment 82 Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 02 /
LI, Zhifeng 8 Pine Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
BELMONT, James, A. 8 Conant Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06847660.5 | 14.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006US47770 | Priority number, date | US20050750242P | 14.12.2005 Original published format: US 750242 P | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007070647 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1969047 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1969047 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/22, G02B1/00 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MODIFIZIERTEN METALLOXIDEN | [2008/38] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MODIFIED METAL OXIDES | [2008/38] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES OXYDES METALLIQUES MODIFIES | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2006 | AT | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | GB | 14.12.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0069392 (SOUTHWEST RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1-63* page 1, lines 1-13; examples 1,3; claim - *; | [X]US2003021566 (SHUSTACK PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 1-63 * paragraphs [0003] , [0029] - [0035] - [0057]; claim - * |