EP1964172 - MULTI-FLUID COOLANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Chumbo 11435 47th Avenue North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | 02 /
GU, Yuandong 17105 12th Avenue North Plymouth, Minnesota 55447 / US | 03 /
KULACKI, Francis A. 5020 Arden Avenue Edina, Minnesota 55424 / US | 04 /
KRISTOFFERSEN, Martin 1691 Village Trail East Maplewood, Minnesota 55109 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06847762.9 | 18.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US48291 | Priority number, date | US20050751506P | 19.12.2005 Original published format: US 751506 P | US20060612241 | 18.12.2006 Original published format: US 612241 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007075599 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1964172 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/473 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F28D15/0266 (EP,US);
C09K5/04 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
F28F13/003 (EP,US);
F28F3/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2008/36] | English: | MULTI-FLUID COOLANT SYSTEM | [2008/36] | French: | SYSTEME REFRIGERANT MULTI-FLUIDE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS59125643 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]US5038571 (YOKOUCHI KISHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,18,28* abstract *; | [A]US5349499 (YAMADA MITSUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,18,28 * abstract *; | [A]US2004112585 (GOODSON KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1,10,18,28 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * |