EP1971933 - METHOD FOR SYSTEMATIC MODELING AND EVALUATION OF APPLICATION FLOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telcordia Technologies, Inc. One Telcordia Drive Piscataway, NJ 08854-4157 / US | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALCHUK, Benjamin W. 14 Castleheights Avenue Upper Nyack, NY 10960 / US | 02 /
KRISHNAN, Komandur R. 56 Shannon Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
LOEB, Shoshana K. 127 West Chestnut Hill Avenue Philadelphia, PA 19118 / US | 04 /
SHALLCROSS, David F. 38A Pleasantview Drive Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848159.7 | 22.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US49277 | Priority number, date | US20050753179P | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 753179 P | US20060441531 | 26.05.2006 Original published format: US 441531 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007076130 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1971933 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/173 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0633 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/04] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYSTEMATISCHEN MODELLIERUNG UND EVALUIERUNG VON ANWENDUNGSABLÄUFEN | [2008/39] | English: | METHOD FOR SYSTEMATIC MODELING AND EVALUATION OF APPLICATION FLOWS | [2008/39] | French: | PROCEDE POUR MODELISER ET EVALUER DES FLUX D'APPLICATIONS | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 23.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 10.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/13] | 06.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - R. POOLEY, "Using uml to derive stochastic process algebra models", (1999), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/summary?doi=10.1.1.44.1049, (20090115), XP002510545 [X] 1-42 * abstract * * page 6 - page 8 * | [X] - V. GRASSI, R. MIRANDOLA, "UML Modelling and Performance Analysis of Mobile Software Architectures", ISBN 978-3-540-42667-7, (2001), pages 209 - 224, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/xy66h9rv6yg0ptl3/fulltext.pdf, (20090115), XP002510546 [X] 1-42 * abstract * * page 215 * * page 221 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45441-1_16 | [X] - JIONG YAN ET AL, "Automatic generation of Markov chain usage models from real-time software UML models", PROCEEDINGS. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON QUALITY SOFTWARE IEEE COMPUT. SOC LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (2004), ISBN 0-7695-2207-6, pages 22 - 31, XP002510547 [X] 1-42 * the whole document * | [A] - LINDEMANN ET AL, "Performance analysis of time-enhanced UML diagrams based on stochastic processes", (2002), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/summary?doi=10.1.1.16.7425, (20090115), XP002510548 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/584369.584375 | [A] - FALKOVYCH ET AL, "UML for the Semantic Web: Transformation-Based Approaches", (2003), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://homepages.cwi.nl/~media/publications/UML_for_SW.pdf, (20090115), XP002510549 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * | [A] - GOMAA H ET AL, "Design and performance modeling of component interconnection patterns for distributed software architectures", PROCEEDINGS SECOND INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SOFTWARE AND PERFORMANCE. WOSP2000 ACM NEW YORK, NY, USA, (2000), ISBN 1-58113-195-X, pages 117 - 126, XP002510550 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/350391.350418 | International search | [Y]US6857014 (PATERSON ROBERT K [CA], et al); | [Y]US2005273757 (ANDERSON CRAIG D [US]); | [Y]US2005197991 (WRAY ROBERT E [US], et al); | [Y]US5754695 (KUO SHYH-SHIAW [US], et al); | [Y]US4885757 (PROVENCE JOHN D [US]); | [Y]US2004148416 (AARNOS JRYKI [FI], et al) |