EP1977382 - JOIN IN-PROGRESS ON-LINE GAME SESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAW, David One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
PROTEAU, Steve One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
HANSEN, Johan Peter One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
BORTNIK, Michal One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
JEN, James One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
O'KELLEY, Patrick W. One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP Rosental 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Gemany LLP Maximilianstrasse 13 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848377.5 | 29.12.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006US49642 | Priority number, date | US20060335953 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 335953 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087078 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977382 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/12 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
A63F13/86 (EP,US);
A63F13/30 (KR);
A63F13/795 (US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
A63F2300/5546 (EP,US);
A63F2300/556 (EP,US);
A63F2300/5566 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSFORTSCHRITT-ONLINE-SPIELSITZUNG | [2008/41] | English: | JOIN IN-PROGRESS ON-LINE GAME SESSION | [2008/41] | French: | PARTIE DE JEU EN LIGNE ACCEPTANT DE NOUVEAUX PARTICIPANTS PENDANT SON DEROULEMENT | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 22.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1519531 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0044] - [0050] - [0 70] - [0075] - [0 76] - [0081] ** figures 5,7,8,11 *; | [I]EP1570887 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 42] , [0 51] - [0053] - [0 63] - [0065] *; | [A]EP1595586 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0077] - [0094] * * figures 4-11 * | International search | [Y]KR20010051235 (ICOMM SOFT [KR]); | [Y]KR20020039909 (INNOVAY INC [KR]); | [A]KR20030048275 (NHN CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20060001274 (NHN CORP [KR]) |