EP1938390 - NANOCRYSTAL SOLAR CELLS PROCESSED FROM SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALIVISATOS, A. Paul 5941 Estates Dr. Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 02 /
GUR, Ilan 816 Alabama Street San Francisco, ca 94110 / US | 03 /
MILLIRON, Delia 221 McKendry Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848406.2 | 20.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US60140 | Priority number, date | US20050728828P | 20.10.2005 Original published format: US 728828 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007065039 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1938390 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352, H01L31/0224 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
H01L31/0352 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | H01L31/04, H01L31/0224 | ||
Former IPC [2008/27] | H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | AUS EINER LÖSUNG GEWONNENE NANOKRISTALL-SOLARZELLEN | [2008/27] | English: | NANOCRYSTAL SOLAR CELLS PROCESSED FROM SOLUTION | [2008/27] | French: | CELLULES SOLAIRES A NANOCRISTAUX PRODUITES A PARTIR D UNE SOLUTION | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - FELDMAN S D ET AL, "Non-uniformity mitigation in CdTe solar cells: the effects of high-resistance transparent conducting oxide buffer layers", PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 2005. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE TH IRTY-FIRST IEEE LAKE BUENA VISTA, FL, USA 3-7 JAN. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20050103), ISBN 978-0-7803-8707-2, pages 271 - 274, XP010822699 [A] 1,9,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.2005.1488121 | International search | [Y]US6878871 (SCHER ERIK [US], et al); | [Y]US4463216 (NAKANO HIROTAKA [JP], et al); | [Y]US4675469 (IIDA HIDEYO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005098204 (ROSCHEISEN MARTIN R [US], et al); | [Y]US6821559 (EBERSPACHER CHRIS [US], et al) |