Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007197523 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61395006 | 20.12.2006 | US75359605 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009521471 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US48925 | 20.12.2006 | US75359605 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006327173 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US48925 | 20.12.2006 | US75359605 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1968956 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US48925 | 20.12.2006 | US75359605 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2634147 | 28.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US48925 | 20.12.2006 | US75359605 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007073497 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2008 | A3 | WO2007073497 | 28.06.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75359605 | 22.12.2005 |