EP1966585 - INTEGRATED DISSOLUTION PROCESSING AND SAMPLE TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sotax Corporation 2400 Computer Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | [2013/48] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Caliper Life Sciences, Inc. 605 Fairchild Drive Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENNEDY, Colin, B. 111 Greenbrae Boardwalk Greenbrae, CA 94904 / US | 02 /
VON BEHREN, Dale 8 King Arthur Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 03 /
HUSAIN, Syed 30 Montclair Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 04 /
BERNAL, Rick 19 Wachusett View Drive Westborough, MA 01581-2647 / US | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06849042.4 | 28.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006US49664 | Priority number, date | US20050755025P | 30.12.2005 Original published format: US 755025 P | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079257 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1966585 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N13/00, G01N33/15 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
G01N13/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/38 (US);
G01N2013/003 (EP,US);
G01N2013/006 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00198 (EP,US);
G01N33/15 (EP,US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES AUFLÖSUNGSVERARBEITUNGS- UND PROBENÜBERGABESYSTEM | [2008/37] | English: | INTEGRATED DISSOLUTION PROCESSING AND SAMPLE TRANSFER SYSTEM | [2008/37] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DISSOLUTION INTÉGRÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2010 | 31.12.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]US4879917 (EPPELMANN HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 60 - line 64 *[X] 20; | [AX]EP0635713 (ZYMARK CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 12 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 31 * [X] 20; | [X]US5816701 (MARTIN ARTHUR L [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - line 67 * * column 3, line 40 - line 48 * * column 6, line 15 - line 42 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 40 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 1 * * column 9, line 55 - line 65 * * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 23 *; | [AX]WO02071033 (VARIAN INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 19, line 31 - page 20, line 3 * [X] 20 |