EP1919864 - FAP INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vantia Limited 1 Venture Road Southampton Science Park Chilworth SO16 7NP / GB | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Ferring B.V. Polarisavenue 144 2123 JX Hoofddorp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, David, Michael 114 Adelaide Road Southampton, S017 2HX / GB | 02 /
HORTON, John 47A Bedford Place Southampton, SO15 2DG / GB | 03 /
TRIM, Julie, Elizabeth 7 Taw Drive Chandlers Ford Southampton, SO53 4SL / GB | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/20] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06849433.5 | 31.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006IB03512 | Priority number, date | EP20050108049 | 02.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05108049 | US20050713324P | 02.09.2005 Original published format: US 713324 P | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007085895 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1919864 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/16 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D207/08 (KR);
A61K31/00 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | FAP-HEMMER | [2008/20] | English: | FAP INHIBITORS | [2008/20] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE FAP | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03002595 (PROBIODRUG AG [DE], et al) [X] 26,27,29,32,34,37 * page 6, paragraph 4; claims 1-4,9 *; | [X]US2004214762 (DEMUTH HANS-ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-14,23-43 * paragraph [0002]; claims 1,4,9 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X]JPH07126229 ; | [A]US2003225102 (SANKARANARAYANAN ALANGUDI [IN]) [A] 1-17,25-43 * paragraph [0090]; table 1; compounds 1,2 * * paragraph [0109] *; | [A]EP0419683 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-17,19,20,25-43 * page 4, line 50 - line 55 * * page 8; compounds I-G * * page 11, line 30 - line 58; claim 1; compounds 19,24 *; | [X]US2003096857 (EVANS DAVID MICHAEL [GB]) [X] 1-17,25-43 * examples 15,16; claims 1,22 *; | [X]EP0536399 (ZERIA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17,19,20,25-43 * page 14; compounds I-F * * page 15, line 35 - line 40; examples 26,27; claim 1; table 2 *; | [A]WO0134594 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17,19,20,23-43 * page 6, line 16; claims 4,6,25 *; | [DA]WO0181337 (FERRING BV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-17,23-43 * examples 1-3,6,10,11; claims 1-6; table - *; | [X]US5286732 (VINCENT MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-14,23-43 * example 5; claim - *; | [X]US5028604 (TORIZUKA MOTOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,19,20,23-43 * examples 14,21; claim - *; | [X]EP1522540 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14,23-43 * page 135, line 30 - line 35; examples 18-21; claim -; table 10 *; | [X]US6017929 (TANAKA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,23-43 * column 5; claim -; compound 5 *; | [X]EP1134213 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1-14,23-43 * example 115; claim - *; | [X]US4826870 (HIGUCHI NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,23-43 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO0010549 (POINT THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14,18-22,25-43 * page 4, paragraph L; figure 1 * * page 2, paragraph 1; claim - *; | [Y]US5462928 (BACHOVCHIN WILLIAM W [US], et al) [Y] 1-14,18-22,25-43 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4873342 (TANAKA TAKAHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,19-22,25-43 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5536737 (KOBAYASHI KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,19-22,25-43 * example 12; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]US5547978 (CHRISTENSEN BURTON G [US], et al) [X] 1-14,19-22,25-43 * example 1; claim - *; | [X] - KOHL A ET AL, "THE ROLE OF DIPEPTIDYLPEPTIDASE IV POSITIVE T CELLS IN WOUND HEALING AND ANGIOGENESIS", AGENTS AND ACTIONS, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG, BASEL, CH, (199101), vol. 32, no. 1/2, ISSN 0065-4299, pages 125 - 127, XP002944505 [X] 26,29 * page 127, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01983337 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 29, Database accession no. 1995-217850, XP002368297 & JPH07126229 A 19950516 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC) [X] 26,27,29,31,36 * abstract * | [X] - TANAKA Y ET AL, "NEW POTENT PROLYL ENDOPEPTIDASE INHIBITORS: SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS OF INDAN AND TETRALIN DERIVATIVES AND THEIRANALOGUES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1994), vol. 37, no. 13, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2071 - 2078, XP002022213 [X] 1-17,19,20,23-43 * tables 1,2; compounds 7,8,10,12,14,16,32,34,29,27,7,8,10,12,14,16,21-25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00039a019 | [X] - WALLÉN ERIK A A ET AL, "New prolyl oligopeptidase inhibitors developed from dicarboxylic acid bis(l-prolyl-pyrrolidine) amides.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY. 9 OCT 2003, (20031009), vol. 46, no. 21, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4543 - 4551, XP002368281 [X] 1-17,19,20,23-43 * page 4547, column L, paragraph L; table 2; compounds 3L-3P * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm030811o | [X] - WILLAND N ET AL, "Solid and solution phase syntheses of the 2-cyanopyrrolidide DPP-IV inhibitor NVP-DPP728", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020708), vol. 58, no. 28, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 5741 - 5746, XP004369423 [X] 1-17,25-43 * compounds 21,1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(02)00536-7 | [X] - VENDEVILLE SANDRINE ET AL, "Comparison of the inhibition of human and Trypanosoma cruzi prolyl endopeptidases.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY. JUN 2002, (200206), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 1719 - 1729, XP002368282 [X] 1-17,19,20,23-43 * page 1719, column R, paragraph 1; figures 1,2; tables 1-3; compounds 1-9,27,31 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(02)00035-4 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1991), XP002465867 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1993), XP002465868 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - KAROLY K ET AL, "Prolyl endopeptidase inhibitors<1> : N-acyl derivatives of L-thioproline-pyrrolidine", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19970708), vol. 7, no. 13, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1701 - 1704, XP004136283 [X] 1-14,23-43 * table 2; compounds 1,2,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)00295-3 | [X] - VENDEVILLE S ET AL, "Automated parallel synthesis of a tetrahydroisoquinolin-based library: potential prolyl endopeptidase inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19990208), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 437 - 442, XP004157243 [X] 1-14,23-43 * table 1; compounds 1B,1C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00003-7 | [X] - WALLEN E A A ET AL, "Conformationally rigid N-acyl-5-alkyl-l-prolyl-pyrrolidines as prolyl oligopeptidase inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (20030815), vol. 11, no. 17, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 3611 - 3619, XP002286663 [X] 1-14,23-43 * table 1; compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(03)00363-8 | [X] - HERMECZ I ET AL, "Prolyl endopeptidase inhibitors.", FARMACO (SOCIETÀ CHIMICA ITALIANA : 1989) MAR 2000, (200003), vol. 55, no. 3, ISSN 0014-827X, pages 188 - 190, XP002465847 [X] 1-14,23-43 * compounds 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-827X(00)00018-5 | [X] - PORTEVIN B ET AL, "NEW PROLYL ENDOPEPTIDASE INHIBITORS: IN VITRO AND IN VIVO ACTIVITIES OF AZABICYCLOÚ2.2.2OCTANE, AZABICYLCOÚ2.2.1HEPTANE, AND PERHYDROINDOLE DERIVATIVES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19960607), vol. 39, no. 12, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2379 - 2391, XP002036250 [X] 1-14,23-43 * table 2; compounds 3,4,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950858c | [X] - BARLOW J J ET AL, "Structure/activity studies related to 2-(3,4-dichlorophenyl)-N-methyl N-[2-(1-pyrrolidinyl)-1-substituted-ethyl]acetamides: a novel series of potent and selective opioid agonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (199111), vol. 34, no. 11, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3149 - 3158, XP002249917 [X] 1-14,23-43 * table 1; compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00115a001 | [X] - OPACIC NINOSLAV ET AL, "The novel L- and D-amino acid derivatives of hydroxyurea and hydantoins: synthesis, X-ray crystal structure study, and cytostatic and antiviral activity evaluations.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 27 JAN 2005, (20050127), vol. 48, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 475 - 482, XP002465848 [X] 1-14,23-43 * page 476; table 1; compounds 4J,4N * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm040869i | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1993), XP002465869 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1959), XP002465870 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - FREIFELDER M, "Isomeric Hydroxyacetanilides by Reductive Acylation of Nitrophenols", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (196203), vol. 27, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1092 - 1093, XP002993727 [X] 1-14,23-43 * page 1093; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01050a543 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1998), XP002465871 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - GARCIA J ET AL, "NITROSATION OF PEPTIDE BONDS CLEAVAGE OF NITROSATED PEPTIDES BY PYRROLIDINE AND ALPHA AMINO ESTERS", TETRAHEDRON, (1984), vol. 40, no. 16, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 3121 - 3128, XP002465849 [X] 1-14,23-43 * table I; compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)82437-6 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1992), XP002465872 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - ROSSITER B E ET AL, "Enantioselective conjugate addition to cyclic enones with scalemic lithium organo(amido)cuprates. Part IV. Relationship between ligand structure and enantioselectivity", TETRAHEDRON 1993 UNITED KINGDOM, (1993), vol. 49, no. 5, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 965 - 986, XP002465850 [X] 1-14,23-43 * table 1; compounds 12A,19A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)86278-5 | [X] - MAZURKIEWICZ R, "An efficient synthesis of N,N-disubstituted 5-aminooxazoles", SYNTHESIS 1992 GERMANY, (1992), no. 10, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 941 - 943, XP002465851 [X] 1-14,23-43 * compounds IC,1D,1G,1H * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1992-26270 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1998), XP002465873 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1993), XP002465874 [X] 1-14,23-43 * column A * | [X] - AMEDJKOUH M ET AL, "Synthesis of chiral diamines using novel 2-trichloromethyloxazolidin- 4-one precursors derived from 5-oxo-proline and proline", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20021018), vol. 13, no. 20, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 2229 - 2234, XP004390583 [X] 1-14,23-43 * compounds 9A,9B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(02)00579-7 | [A] - COUTTS S J ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS OF BORONIC ACID INHIBITORS OF DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE IV. I. VARIATION OF THE P2 POSITION OF XAA-BOROPRO DIPEPTIDES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1996), vol. 39, no. 10, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2087 - 2094, XP002074031 [A] 1-14,18-22,25-43 * page 2088, column R; table 1; compounds 1A,1B,1Q,1P * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950732f | [A] - MCINTYRE J A ET AL, "Talabostat. Oncolytic, hematopoietic agent, dipeptidyl-peptidase IV (CD26) inhibitor, fibroblast activation protein inhibitor", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (200409), vol. 29, no. 9, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 882 - 886, XP002465852 [A] 1-14,18-22,25-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2004.029.09.845410 | [X] - TOIDE K ET AL, "A NOVEL PROLYL ENDOPEPTIDASE INHIBITOR, JTP-4819, FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE: REVIEW OF PRECLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY", CNS DRUG REVIEWS, BRANFORD, CT, US, (1996), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1080-563X, pages 343 - 362, XP009012974 [X] 1-14,19-22,25-43 * page 358 - page 359; figure 1 * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1996), XP002465875 [X] 1-14,19-22,25-43 * column A * | [X] - TSUTSUMI S ET AL, "Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of peptidyl alpha-keto heterocycles as novel inhibitors of prolyl endopeptidase", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1994), vol. 37, no. 21, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3492 - 3502, XP002265524 [X] 1-14,19-22,25-43 * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00047a007 | [X] - BASTOS IZABELA M D ET AL, "Molecular, functional and structural properties of the prolyl oligopeptidase of Trypanosoma cruzi (POP Tc80), which is required for parasite entry into mammalian cells.", THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL 15 MAY 2005, (20050515), vol. 388, no. Pt 1, ISSN 1470-8728, pages 29 - 38, XP002465866 [X] 1-14,19-22,25-43 * table 2 * |