EP1960771 - SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Diabetes Care, Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2010/49] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Abbott Diabetes Care, Inc. 1420 Harbor Bay Parkway, Suite 290 Alameda, CA 94502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yi 521 Winding Brook Court San Ramon, CA 94582 / US | 02 /
SCOTT, Steve 7753 Country Lane Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06849895.5 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006US44792 | Priority number, date | US20050282001 | 17.11.2005 Original published format: US 282001 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007086997 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1960771 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1960771 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
G01N33/525 (EP,US);
G01N33/526 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOREN | [2008/35] | English: | SENSORS | [2008/35] | French: | DETECTEURS POUR ECHANTILLONS | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10011248.1 / EP2317314 | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002053523 (LIAMOS CHARLES T [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0127] * * claims 1-22 *; | [X]US2002100685 (HUANG YING-CHE [TW], et al) [X] 1-37 * figures 7,9 * * paragraphs [0033] , [0051] , [0068] * * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]US2003196894 (CAI XIAOHUA [US], et al) [Y] 1-37 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0032] * * claims 1-43 *; | [Y]WO03091717 (HOME DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1548427 (GUNZE KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-37* the whole document *; | [E]WO2007033007 (ABBOTT DIABETES CARE INC [US], et al) [E] 1-37 * figure 1 * * claims 1-44 * * page 2 - page 4 * * page 10 * |