EP2102568 - AIR-CONDITIONING ALGORITHM FOR WATER TERMINAL FREE COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | 02.04.2022 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | [2016/09] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington CT 06034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSSERAND, Olivier RN 1526, 3 Le Plantieu F-01120 La Boisse / FR | 02 /
ROYET, Eric 324 rue du Canal F-01120 Thil / FR | 03 /
GOUX, JeanPhilippe 17 chemin des Violettes F-69780 Toussieu / FR | 04 /
RENAULT, Patrick 218 Gd rue de la Guillotière Lyon 69007 / FR | [2016/09] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
JOSSERAND, Olivier RN 1526, 3 Le Plantieu F-01120 La Boisse / FR | ||
02 /
ROYET, Eric 324 rue du Canal F-01120 Thil / FR | |||
03 /
GOUX, JeanPhilippe 17 chemin des Violettes F-69780 Toussieu / FR | |||
04 /
RENAULT, Patrick 218 Gd rue de la Guillotiére Lyon 69007 / FR | |||
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
JOSSERAND, Olivier RN 1526, 3 Le Plantieu F-01120 La Boisse / FR | ||
02 /
ROYET, Eric 324 rue du Canal F-01120 Thil / FR | |||
03 /
GOUX, JeanPhilippe 17 chemin des Violettes F-69780 Toussieu / FR | |||
04 /
RENAULT, Patrick .218 Gd rue de la Guillotiére Lyon 69007 / FR | |||
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
JOSSERAND, Olivier RN 1526, 3 Le Plantieu F-01120 La Boisse / FR | ||
02 /
ROYET, Eric 324 rue du Canal F-01120 Thil / FR | |||
03 /
GOUX, JeanPhilippe 17 chemin des Violettes F-69780 Toussieu / FR | |||
04 /
RENAULT, Patrick . . / FR | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/16] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06850040.4 | 29.12.2006 | [2009/39] | WO2006US49628 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008082398 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102568 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102568 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/30, F24F110/10, F24F110/70, F24F11/00 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,US);
F24F11/63 (EP,US);
F24F11/81 (EP,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,US);
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
F24F2011/0006 (EP,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,US);
F24F2110/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | F25D17/00, F24F11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/39] | F25D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTKLIMATISIERUNGSALGORITHMUS FÜR WASSERTERMINALFREIKÜHLUNG | [2009/39] | English: | AIR-CONDITIONING ALGORITHM FOR WATER TERMINAL FREE COOLING | [2009/39] | French: | ALGORITHME DE CLIMATISATION POUR REFROIDISSEMENT LIBRE DE TERMINAL D'EAU | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 16.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.12.2016
07.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.12.2016
07.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 07.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.01.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/18] | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 18.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T0794/19 | 17.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T0794/19 | 17.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 20.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2006 | AT | 02.03.2016 | BE | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | IT | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | IE | 29.12.2016 | LU | 29.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.12.2006 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.12.2016 | ||
LU | 29.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.12.2016 | ||
LU | 29.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 02.03.2016 | |
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4244517 (STANKE DENNIS A, et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 4, line 31 - line 41 * [I] 2; | [XI]US4830274 (JOHNSON TEDD P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 7; figure 1 * * abstract * [I] 2,3; | [A]WO9010180 (VADELAS PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [Y]US5025638 (YAMAGISHI KATSUAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 4 *; | [XI]GB2258744 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0003] * * page 4, paragraphs 2,5; figures 1,2 * [I] 2,5-15; | [XYI]EP0632234 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 25 - line 35 * * column 13, line 5 - line 11 * [Y] 4 [I] 5-15; | [A]US5707005 (KETTLER JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1004828 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 4 * abstract * | International search | [X]US6634422 (RAYBURN RONALD RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US2004148950 (CATZEL PINCUS [ZA]) | by applicant | EP0632234 | Opposition | US4244517 | US4253153 | US4830274 | WO9010180 | US5025638 | GB2258744 | US5337574 | EP0632234 | US5404934 | US5707005 | US5976010 | EP1004828 | US2005028970 | US2006185373 | - "Das Regelungssymbol NIPU (Nightpurge)", EXCEL 500, Honeywell-CARE, BI 2. 1, (19921000), pages 14-1 - 14-4, XP055341537 | - "7.5.4. Luftqualität und Personen-präsenz", Steuern und Regeln in der Heizungs- und Lüftungstechnik, Impulsprogramm Haustechnik, 2., (19870501), pages 166 - 169, XP055341236 | - Hermann Recknagel, Eberhard Sprenger, Ernst-Rudolf Schramek, Taschenbuch für Heizung und Klimatechnik 2003. Einschließlich Warmwasser- und Kältetechnik, Oldenbourg, vol. 03/04, pages 1154 - 1157, 1174-1179, ISBN 3-486-26534-2, XP055341246 |