EP1964300 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SIGNAL RECONSTRUCTION FROM SPATIALLY AND TEMPORALLY CORRELATED RECEIVED SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORIAGA, Joseph B. c/o Qualcomm Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 7794 Roan Road San Diego, California 92129 / US | 03 /
HOU, Jilei 1014 Beacon Bay Drive Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Jinghu c/o Qualcomm Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
SMEE, John Edward c/o Qualcomm Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2008/39] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
SORIAGA, Joseph B. 8950 Costa Verde Boulevard, 4330 San Diego, California 92122 / US | ||
02 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 7794 Roan Road San Diego, California 92129 / US | |||
03 /
HOU, Jilei 1014 Beacon Bay Drive Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Jinghu 8155 Cargill Avenue, 2 San Diego, California 92122 / US | |||
05 /
SMEE, John Edward 5340 Toscana Way, F-406 San Diego, California 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06850883.7 | 05.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US61633 | Priority number, date | US20050748128P | 06.12.2005 Original published format: US 748128 P | US20060501972 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: US 501972 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007120317 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1964300 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7107 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
H04L1/1607 (EP,US);
H04L27/227 (KR);
H04B1/709 (KR);
H04B1/71072 (EP,US);
H04B1/7117 (KR);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04L1/208 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L1/1858 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/03254 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | H04L1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SIGNALREKONSTRUKTION AUS RÄUMLICH UND ZEITLICH KORRELIERENDEN ABTASTUNGEN | [2008/36] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SIGNAL RECONSTRUCTION FROM SPATIALLY AND TEMPORALLY CORRELATED RECEIVED SAMPLES | [2008/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RECONSTRUCTION DE SIGNAUX À PARTIR D'ÉCHANTILLONS REÇUS CORRÉLÉS DANS L'ESPACE ET DANS LE TEMPS | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2012 | 23.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | EP1179891 |