EP1963394 - LATEX WITH ISOCYANATE CROSSLINKER AS BINDER FOR FIBROUS SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANISLAWCZYK, Vic 18855 Heritage Trail Strongsville, Ohio 44136 / US | 02 /
WOLFINGER, Mark, W. 18405 Bishop Lane Strongsville, Ohio 44136 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Weber, Thomas Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06850979.3 | 18.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US62211 | Priority number, date | US20050753137P | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 753137 P | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007120341 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1963394 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/70, C08G18/80, D04H1/64, D06M15/263 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
C08G18/706 (EP,US);
C08G18/80 (EP,US);
D04H1/587 (EP,US);
D04H1/64 (EP,US);
D21H21/18 (EP,US);
D21H17/37 (EP,US);
D21H17/57 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31547 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2762 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2861 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2926 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | LATEX MIT EINEM ISOCYANATVERNETZER ALS BINDER FÜR FASERSUBSTRATE | [2008/36] | English: | LATEX WITH ISOCYANATE CROSSLINKER AS BINDER FOR FIBROUS SUBSTRATES | [2008/36] | French: | LATEX AVEC AGENT DE RÉTICULATION À L'ISOCYANATE COMME AGENT DE LIAISON POUR SUBSTRATS FIBREUX | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5159011 (RAU MARIA G [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, lines 5-33 * * column 9, lines 53-60 * * column 10, lines 21-31; claims 1-9 *; | [X]US3269860 (RICHARDSON SPENCER M, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 64; examples I-X * * claims 1-8 *; | [X]GB1162409 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1-18 *; | [DA]US5030507 (MUDGE PAUL [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document * | Examination | DE10009412 | - Karl-Ludwig Noble, "Waterborne polyurethanes", Progress in Organic Coatings, doi:10.1016/S0300-9440(97)00071-4, (19970101), pages 131 - 136, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0300944097000714/pdfft?md5=ad8a70087e0a8683c3df68bbc79fdb77&pid=1-s2.0-S0300944097000714-main.pdf, (20161128), XP055323437 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-9440(97)00071-4 | - KIM B K ED - REHAGE HEINZ ET AL, "Aqueous polyurethane dispersions", COLLOID & POLYMER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, (19960101), vol. 274, no. 7, ISSN 0303-402X, pages 599 - 611, XP002593853 |