EP1991723 - METHODS OF MAKING SPATIALLY ALIGNED NANOTUBES AND NANOTUBE ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building, 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, John A. 4305 Brittany Trail Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | 02 /
COSKUN, Kocabas Bilkent University, Department of Physics Advanced Research Laboratories 06800 Ankara / TR | 03 /
SHIM, Moonsub 401 Gentian Street Savoy, IL 61874 / US | 04 /
KANG, Seong Jun 1317 West Ridge Ln. Champaign, IL 61822 / US | 05 /
PARK, Jang-Ung 807 Oakland Ave., Apt. 202 Urbana, IL 61802 / US | [2010/14] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
ROGERS, John A. 4305 Brittany Trail Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | ||
02 /
COSKUN, Kocabas 1008 E. Kerr Ave., Apt. 203 Urbana, IL 61802 / US | |||
03 /
SHIM, Moonsub 401 Gentian Street Savoy, IL 61874 / US | |||
04 /
KANG, Seong Jun 1317 West Ridge Ln. Champaign, IL 61822 / US | |||
05 /
PARK, Jang-Ung 807 Oakland Ave., Apt. 202 Urbana, IL 61802 / US | |||
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
ROGERS, John A. 4305 Brittany Trail Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | ||
02 /
KOCABAS, Coskun 1008 E. Kerr Ave., Apt. 203 Urbana, IL 61802 / US | |||
03 /
SHIM, Moonsub 401 Gentian Street Savoy, IL 61874 / US | |||
04 /
KANG, Seong Jun 1317 West Ridge Ln. Champaign, IL 61822 / US | |||
05 /
PARK, Jang-Ung 807 Oakland Ave., Apt. 202 Urbana, IL 61802 / US | |||
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
ROGERS, John A. 4305 Brittany Trail Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | ||
02 /
COSKUN, Kocabas 1008 E. Kerr Ave., Apt. 203 Urbana, IL 61802 / US | |||
03 /
SHIM, Moonsub 401 Gentian Street Savoy, IL 61874 / US | |||
04 /
KANG, Seong Jun 1317 West Ridge Ln. Champaign, IL 61822 / US | |||
05 /
PARK, Jang-Ung 807 Oakland Ave., Apt. 202 Urbana, IL 61802 / US | Representative(s) | Shaw, Matthew Nigel Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Shaw, Matthew Nigel Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06851125.2 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/47] | WO2006US32125 | Priority number, date | US20060779714P | 03.03.2006 Original published format: US 779714 P | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007126412 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991723 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D01F9/12 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/162 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H10K71/191 (EP,US);
H10K85/221 (EP,US);
C01B2202/02 (EP,US);
C01B2202/08 (EP,US);
C01B2202/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG RÄUMLICH AUSGERICHTETER NANORÖHRCHEN UND NANORÖHRCHENANORDNUNGEN | [2008/47] | English: | METHODS OF MAKING SPATIALLY ALIGNED NANOTUBES AND NANOTUBE ARRAYS | [2008/47] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER DES NANOTUBES OU DES ENSEMBLES DE NANOTUBES ALIGNES DANS L'ESPACE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 17.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02097724 (ALIEN TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005017962 (NANOSYS INC [US], et al); | [XP]US2006279191 (GEOHEGAN DAVID B [US], et al); | [Y] - MEITL ET AL., "Solution Casting and Transfer Printing Single-Walled Carbon Nanotube Films", NANO LETT., (2004), vol. 4, no. 9, pages 1643 - 1647, XP008128691 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl0491935 | [XP] - KOCABAS ET AL., "Large Area Aligned Arrays of SWNTs for High Performance Thin Film Transistors", AMERICAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, APS MARCH MEETING, (20060313), page ABSTR. NO. #W31.004, XP008128809 | [YP] - BACHTOLD ET AL., "Logic Circuits with Carbon Nanotube Transistors", SCIENCE, (200111), vol. 29, pages 1317 - 1319, XP008128694 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1065824 | [Y] - ANDO ET AL., "Self-aligned self-assembly process for fabricating organic thin-film transistors", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (200409), vol. 85, no. 10, pages 1849 - 1851, XP001226713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1784871 | [X] - ALLEN ET AL., "Nanomaterial transfer using hot embossing for flexible electronic devices", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (200602), vol. 88, pages 083112-1 - 083112-3, XP002442342 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2178414 | [X] - KOCABAS ET AL., "Guided Growth of Large-Scale, Horizontally Aligned Arrays of Single-Walled Carbon Nanotubes and Their Use in Thin-Film Transistors", SMALL, (2005), vol. 1, no. 11, pages 1110 - 1116, XP008128696 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.200500120 | [X] - KOCABAS ET AL., "Spatially Selective Guided Growth of High-Coverage Arrays and Random Networks of Single-Walled Carbon Nanotubes and Their Integration into Electronic Devices", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (200601), vol. 128, pages 4540 - 4541, XP008128699 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0603150 | [Y] - LIN ET AL., "High-Performance Carbon Nanotube Field-Effect Transistor With Tunable Polarities", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NANOTECHNOLOGY, (200509), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 481 - 487, XP008128700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNANO.2005.851427 | [Y] - HAN ET AL., "Template-Free Dimensional Growth of Single-Walled Carbon Nanotubes on a- and r-Plane Sapphire", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 5294 - 5295, XP008128701 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja042544x |