EP1926588 - A POLARIZER BASED ON A NANOWIRE GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wostec, Inc. 345 Edgehill Way San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMIRNOV, Valery K. Furmanova St. 1, Ap. 70 Yaroslavl, 150003 / RU | 02 /
KIBALOV, Dmitry S. Krasnoborskaya 31-66 Yaroslavl, 150051 / RU | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06851545.1 | 01.06.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006US21564 | Priority number, date | US20050686495P | 01.06.2005 Original published format: US 686495 P | US20060421384 | 31.05.2006 Original published format: US 421384 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008036064 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1926588 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G02B5/3058 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
Y10S438/974 (EP,US);
Y10S438/982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249961 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | B29D11/00, G02B5/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF EINEM NANODRAHTGITTER BASIERENDER POLARISATOR | [2008/23] | English: | A POLARIZER BASED ON A NANOWIRE GRID | [2008/23] | French: | POLARISEUR À GRILLE DE NANOFILS | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2015 | 01.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/09] | 19.10.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2008 | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4009933 (FIRESTER ARTHUR HERBERT) [A] 1-42 * abstract *; | [DY]RU2204179 (OOO AGE, et al) [DY] 1-42 * abstract *; | [A]US2003152787 (ARAKAWA FUMIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-42* abstract *; | [Y]US2004201890 (CROSBY IAN [GB]) [Y] 1-42 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4233109 (NISHIZAWA JUNICHI); | [Y]US2003171076 (MOLONEY GERARD S [US], et al); | [A]US2004070829 (KURTZ ANDREW F [US], et al); | [X]US2004174596 (UMEKI KAZUHIRO [JP]); | [A]US2005046943 (SUGANUMA TAKAYOSHI [JP]); | [O]US2006273067 (SMIRNOV VALERY K [RU], et al) | Examination | RU2240280 | EP1681262 | US2008119034 |